Thompson et al v. Dauphinais et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00218 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
157
11/27/2018
USCA Order
158
12/06/2018
Notice (Other)
159
12/27/2018
USCA Order
160
01/11/2019
USCA Order
161
02/26/2019
Order
162
02/26/2019
USCA Mandate
163
03/11/2019
Judgment
164
03/18/2019
Notice of Appearance
03/25/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
165
03/18/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
167
04/05/2019
Notice (Other)
168
05/08/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.