Thornton et al v. Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2014-cv-00340 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 568 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/09/2014
COMPLAINT against Bloomin' Brands, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602031936.), filed by Christopher Thornton and Joyce Gilmore.
1
Filing Fee Receipt) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/13/2014 to correct fund category
1 Attachment
2
05/09/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joyce Gilmore and Christopher Thornton.
3
05/12/2014
Summons Issued as to Bloomin' Brands, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with 1 Complaint.
4
05/19/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of 3 Summons and 1 Complaint signed by (ILLEGIBLE) for Bloomin' Brands, Inc. served on 5/15/2014, answer due 6/5/2014. (West Shore Address used pursuant to conversation with Plf's Atty)
5
06/09/2014
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant by Joyce Gilmore, Christopher Thornton.
06/09/2014
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Christopher Thornton against Bloomin' Brands, Inc., as construed by the Court in its 6 Order. (No PDF document attached to this entry; see 5 Motion for Default Judgment.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
06/10/2014
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate the pending 5 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment and to construe the document as an Application to the Clerk for Entry of Default; further ORDERED that the Application to the Clerk for Entry of Default (Doc. # 5) is REFERRED to the Clerk of the Court for disposition. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/10/14.
06/10/2014
File referred to Clerk of Court re 5 Application. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
06/11/2014
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
8
06/12/2014
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bloomin' Brands, Inc. Corporate Disclosures due by 6/23/2014.
1
Standing ORDER and sample format
1 Attachment
06/16/2014
Application for Entry of Default 6 will not be entered as an Answer has been filed. (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/17/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
10
07/29/2014
RULE 26(f) ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than August 19, 2014, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/29/14.
11
07/29/2014
GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/29/14.
12
08/19/2014
MOTION to Continue by Joyce Gilmore, Christopher Thornton. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2014: # 1 Corrected certificate of service).
13
08/19/2014
TEXT ORDER granting 12 Motion to Continue; Rule 26(f) report deadline continued from 8/19/2014 to 8/26/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/19/14. (No PDF document attached to this entry.)
14
08/22/2014
MOTION to Dismiss by Joyce Gilmore, Christopher Thornton.
15
08/22/2014
ORDER directing that, upon consideration of Plaintiff's unopposed motion to dismiss (Doc. # 14), and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) which requires dismissal only by court order, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice; the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/22/14.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.