Thornton v. Bayer Properties, Llc. et al (consent)
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2015-cv-00757 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/15/2015
COMPLAINT against Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602038706.), filed by Christopher Thornton.
1
Filing Fee Receipt
1 Attachment
2
10/15/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Thornton.
3
10/16/2015
Summons Issued as to Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.; mailed CMRRR with copy of 1 complaint.
10/16/2015
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Christopher Thornton (no pdf document attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/20/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and 1 Complaint signed by Avery Harris for NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC. served on 10/19/2015, answer due 11/9/2015.
5
10/21/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Laura Payne for Bayer Properties, LLC. served on 10/19/2015, answer due 11/9/2015.
6
11/09/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
11/09/2015
***Attorney Eric Dewone Coleman for Bayer Properties, LLC.,Eric Dewone Coleman for NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC. added pursuant to the 6 motion. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/09/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint on or before November 16, 2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/9/2015. (no pdf document attached to this entry)
8
11/20/2015
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
9
11/20/2015
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bayer Properties, LLC. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/30/2015.
1
Corporate/Conflict Attachment
1 Attachment
10
11/20/2015
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC. Corporate Disclosures due by 11/30/2015.
1
Corporate/Conflict Attachment
1 Attachment
11/20/2015
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
11/23/2015
ORDERED that on or before December 14, 2015, the opposing party shall show cause why the 8 motion should not be granted; Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete and send to the Clerk of the Court either the attached form consenting to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction or the form requesting reassignment to a District Judge so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before December 14, 2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/23/2015.
12
11/23/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC. re 9 & 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 11/24/2015 to correct the docket entry relationship.
13
12/07/2015
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
14
12/14/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Christopher Thornton.
15
12/18/2015
MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Oral Argument by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
16
12/21/2015
ORDERED that the defendants' 15 motion for leave to file a reply be and is hereby GRANTED. The defendants shall file their reply on or before December 29,2015. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/21/2015.
17
12/23/2015
Objection to re 16 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 15 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Oral Argument filed by Christopher Thornton.
18
12/29/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - UNOPPOSED by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
19
12/30/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of Dfts Motion to Dismiss to and including 1/29/2016. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/30/2015. (No pdf attached to this entry)
20
01/12/2016
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Thornton.
21
01/12/2016
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
22
01/20/2016
MOTION for Protective Order Unopposed Motion for Entry of Protective Order by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
23
01/27/2016
ORDERED that the 22 motion for entry of a protective order be and is hereby DENIED. On or before February 10, 2016, the defendants may file a renewed motion with a proposed order that comports with Chicago Tribune. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/27/2016.
24
01/29/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
25
02/01/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendants' deadline to file their Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss until February 12, 2016. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/1/2016. (no pdf document attached to this entry)
26
02/12/2016
MOTION for Protective Order (Renewed-Unopposed) by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
1
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order
1 Attachment
27
02/18/2016
ORDER granting 26 Motion for Protective Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/18/2016.
28
02/23/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support, 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
29
02/23/2016
ORDERED that the 28 motion for an extension of time be and is hereby GRANTED and the deadline for filing a reply to the plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss be and is hereby EXTENDED from February 12, 2016 until March 7, 2016. The defendants are specifically advised that absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/23/2016.
30
03/07/2016
MOTION to Withdraw 13 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support (Motion to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss (UNOPPOSED) by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
31
03/07/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC.
32
03/08/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 30 MOTION TO WITHDRAW 8 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/8/2016. (no pdf document attached to this entry)
33
03/10/2016
ORDERED that the FED.R.CIV.P. 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than March 31, 2016, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/10/2016.
34
03/31/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
35
04/01/2016
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2017 10:00 AM in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2017; Non-Jury Trial set for 4/24/2017 10:00 AM in Montgomery, Alabama before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody; Dispositive Motions due by 9/22/2016; Mediation Notice due by 9/29/2016; Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2016; Discovery due by 8/23/2016. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/1/2016. (furn: WS, Calendar) (Main Document 35 replaced on 4/1/2016). Modified on 4/1/2016 to reflect Jury Selection was set in error and terminated.
36
05/27/2016
MOTION for a Settlement Conference by Christopher Thornton. Modified on 5/27/2016 to clarify the docket text.
37
05/27/2016
MOTION to Modify EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES OR STAY DISCOVERY FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE OR MEDIATION by Christopher Thornton.
38
06/02/2016
NOTICE by Bayer Properties, LLC., NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC. NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
39
06/02/2016
ORDERED that the 37 motion to alter expert discovery deadlines be and is hereby GRANTED to the extent that the deadlines for expert disclosures be and are hereby EXTENDED by 63 days; the plaintiff's expert report is due on September 23, 2016 and the defendants' expert report is due on October 21, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the motion to stay discovery be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/2/2016.
06/06/2016
***Attorney Sharonda Childs Fancher for Bayer Properties, LLC. and NP/I&G Eastchase Property Owner, LLC. added pursuant to the 38 notice. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
06/09/2016
ORDER construing 36 motion for a settlement conference as a motion to order mediation, as further set out in order; ORDER granting 36 Motion for Mediation; The Honorable Wallace Capel is the Magistrate Judge randomly assigned to mediate this case and the parties are DIRECTED to contact Judge Capel's chambers at (334) 954-3730 within fourteen days of the date of this order to schedule mediation. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/9/2016.
41
06/27/2016
ORDERED that this matter is set for a mediation conference on July 14, 2016, at 9:00 AM, in Courtroom 5A, United States Courthouse, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. It is further ORDERED that counsel and the parties or a representative with full authority to settle the case shall appear at and attend this conference. Plaintiff should be prepared to present documents substantiating any claims for damages. On or before 1:00 PM on July 12, 2016, each party shall provide the undersigned with a confidential mediation conference statement. The statement should not be filed with the clerk's office and should not be served on the other parties, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/27/2016. (furn: calendar, WS, KF)
07/14/2016
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr: Mediation Conference held on 7/14/2016 (No PDF attached). (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
07/15/2016
ORDERED that this matter will reconvene on August 1, 2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 5A, United States Courthouse, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. It is further ORDERED that counsel and the parties or a representative with full authority to settle the case shall appear at and attend this conference. Plaintiff should be prepared to present documents substantiating any claims for damages. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/15/2016. (furn: KF, WS, Calendar)
43
07/29/2016
NOTICE by Christopher Thornton Of Settlement
44
08/01/2016
ORDERED that the mediation, currently scheduled for 8/1/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 5A, United States Courthouse, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama, is CANCELLED. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 8/1/2016. (furn: calendar, kf)
45
08/01/2016
ORDERED that on or before 8/15/2016, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/1/2016.
46
08/15/2016
MOTION for Extension of Deadline re 45 Order by Christopher Thornton.
47
08/16/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Deadline re 45 Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/16/2016. (No pdf attached to this entry)
48
08/22/2016
Second MOTION for Extension of Deadline re 47 Order on Motion for Extension of Deadline by Christopher Thornton.
49
08/23/2016
OPINION and ORDER: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that this lawsuit be and is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs, as further set out in order; further ORDERED that all pending deadlines are terminated and all pending motions are hereby DENIED as moot; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/23/2016. (furn: calendar, ws) (term: PTC for 03/21/2017; Non-Jury Trial for 04/24/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2016: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.