Thornton v. Harper Family Partnership ltd (joint Assign)(mag+)
Court Docket Sheet

3:2014-cv-00672 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 488 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/11/2014
COMPLAINT against Harper Family Partnership LTD, Harpo Corporation (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602032525.), filed by Christopher Thornton.
1
fee receipt
1 Attachment
2
07/11/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Thornton.
3
07/14/2014
Summons Issued as to Harper Family Partnership LTD, Harpo Corporation and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendants.
4
07/16/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Elizabeth D. (illegible) for Harpo Corporation served on 7/15/2014, answer due 8/5/2014.
5
07/17/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Vandy Harper for Harper Family Partnership LTD served on 7/15/2014, answer due 8/5/2014.
6
07/21/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Deanna L. Forbush on behalf of Harper Family Partnership LTD
7
07/22/2014
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Harper Family Partnership LTD; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/1/2014.
1
standing order & format
1 Attachment
8
07/23/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Harper Family Partnership LTD re 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement.
9
08/05/2014
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Harper Family Partnership LTD.
10
08/07/2014
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Christopher Thornton against Harpo Corporation.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
2
Exhibit Exhibit B
3
Exhibit Exhibit C
3 Attachments
08/08/2014
File referred to Clerk re: 10 application (NO PDF Document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
08/08/2014
MOTION for Protective Order by Christopher Thornton.
08/08/2014
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default 10 will not be entered as to Harpo Corporation as service was not proper. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
08/08/2014
NOTICE by Harper Family Partnership LTD re 10 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY OF SERVICE.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
2
Exhibit Exhibit B
3
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01712332598" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01712332598','54669','38','','2','1','',''}};">3</a> Exhibit Exhibit C) Modified on 8/11/2014 to correct docket text to reflect that Harpo Corporation IS NOT a filer pursuant to PDF document. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2014: #
4
Corrected certificate of service
4 Attachments
13
08/08/2014
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Christopher Thornton against Harpo Corporation.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
08/11/2014
File referred to Clerk of Court re 13 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default. (No PDF document attached to this entry.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
08/11/2014
NOTICE by Harper Family Partnership LTD ERRATA TO DEFICIENCY OF SERVICE (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2014: # 1 Corrected certificate of service).
15
08/12/2014
NOTICE by Harper Family Partnership LTD re 14 Notice (Other) Supplement Notice of Deficiency of Service (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2014 to add the exhibit PDF documents previously omitted by E-Filer: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (qc/djy,).
16
08/12/2014
RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Harper Family Partnership LTD. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2014 to add the signed declaration of attorney Forbush: # 1 Signed declaration) (qc/djy,).
17
08/12/2014
MOTION to Withdraw Protective Order by Christopher Thornton.
18
08/13/2014
NOTICE of Correction re 15 Notice to add the exhibit A through D PDF documents previously omitted by E-Filer
1
Exhibit A to Docket Entry
2
Exhibit B to Docket Entry
3
Exhibit C to Docket Entry
4
Exhibit D to Docket Entry
15
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01702333996" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01702333996','54669','47','','2','1','',''}};">15</a>)
5 Attachments
19
08/13/2014
NOTICE of Correction re 16 Response in Opposition to Motion to add the signed declaration of attorney Forbush
1
Signed declaration of Forbush attached to Docket Entry
16
https://ecf.almd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01702334006" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01702334006','54669','50','','2','1','',''}};">16</a>)
2 Attachments
20
08/13/2014
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Withdraw 11 Motion for Protective Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/13/14.
21
08/19/2014
MOTION to Dismiss Harpo Corporation by Christopher Thornton.
22
08/20/2014
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller no longer assigned to the case.
09/05/2014
The Clerk will not enter a Default in this matter pursuant to Renewed Application for Entry of Default 13 as there has not been good service on Defendant Harpo Corporation. (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/08/2014
JUDGMENT: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that plaintiff Christopher Thornton's 21 MOTION to Dismiss is granted and that defendant Harpo Corporation is dismissed without prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs. Defendant Harpo Corporation is terminated as a party. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/8/2014.
24
09/08/2014
RULE 26(F) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/22/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/8/2014.
25
09/19/2014
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
26
09/22/2014
MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Thornton.
27
09/23/2014
JUDGMENT: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that the 26 Motion to Dismiss is granted and that this cause is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/23/2014.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
28
09/24/2014
MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Judgment, by Harper Family Partnership LTD.
29
09/29/2014
RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Judgment, filed by Christopher Thornton.
10/08/2014
Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2014 at 01:15 PM by telephone before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
10/10/2014
TEXT ORDER: Resetting Telephone Conference now set for 10/15/14 at 1:15 PM to 10/15/2014 02:45 PM by telephone before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Entered by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/10/2014.
31
10/10/2014
REPLY BRIEF re 29 Response in Opposition to Motion to Amend Final Judgment filed by Harper Family Partnership LTD.
32
10/14/2014
REPLY BRIEF re 29 Response in Opposition to Motion to Amend Final Judgment filed by Harper Family Partnership LTD.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
2
Exhibit Exhibit B
3
Exhibit Exhibit C
4
Exhibit Exhibit D
5
Exhibit Exhibit E
6
Exhibit Exhibit F
7
Exhibit Exhibit G
8
Exhibit Exhibit H
9
Exhibit Exhibit I
10
Exhibit Exhibit J
11
Exhibit Exhibit K
12
Exhibit Exhibit L
13
Exhibit Exhibit M
14
Exhibit Exhibit N
15
Exhibit Exhibit O
16
Exhibit Exhibit P
17
Exhibit Exhibit Q
18
Exhibit Exhibit R
19
Exhibit Exhibit S
19 Attachments
33
10/15/2014
Evidentiary Submission re 29 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Christopher Thornton.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
34
10/15/2014
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Telephone Conference held on 10/15/2014 (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time FTR: 2:59 - 3:01.)
35
10/21/2014
ORDER GRANTING 28 MOTION to Amend, etc. to the extent that the 27 final judgment does not prevent the defendant from filing, by no later than 10/22/2014, the types of motions listed in the defendant's post-judgment filings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/21/14.
36
10/22/2014
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Harper Family Partnership LTD.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A
2
Exhibit Exhibit B
3
Exhibit Exhibit C
4
Exhibit Exhibit D
5
Exhibit Exhibit E
6
Exhibit Exhibit F
7
Exhibit Exhibit G
8
Exhibit Exhibit H
9
Exhibit Exhibit I
10
Exhibit Exhibit J
11
Exhibit Exhibit K
12
Exhibit Exhibit L
13
Exhibit Exhibit M
14
Exhibit Exhibit N
15
Exhibit Exhibit O
16
Exhibit Exhibit P
17
Exhibit Exhibit Q
18
Exhibit Exhibit R
19
Exhibit Exhibit S
19 Attachments
10/22/2014
MEMORANDUM in Support of 36 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Harper Family Partnership LTD (NO PDF Document attached to this notice-See Docket Entry 36. (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
10/30/2014
ORDER directing that the 36 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs is set for submission, without oral argument, on 11/27/2014 ; with any Opposition brief due by 11/20/2014; and any Reply to the opposition due by 11/27/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/30/14.
38
11/12/2014
CORRECTED ORDER directing that the 36 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs is set for Submission, without oral argument, on 12/3/2014, with any Opposition brief due by 11/20/2014; and any Reply to the opposition due by 12/3/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/12/14.
39
11/20/2014
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Christopher Thornton.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
40
11/20/2014
MOTION to Strike 36 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Christopher Thornton.
11/25/2014
Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene. Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody no longer assigned to the case as referral judge (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
11/25/2014
ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Honorable Paul Greene, United States Magistrate Judge, for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/25/14.
42
12/03/2014
RESPONSE to Motion re 40 MOTION to Strike 36 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Harper Family Partnership LTD.
43
12/03/2014
REPLY to Response to Motion re 36 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Harper Family Partnership LTD. Modified on 12/4/2014 to clarify text to reflect as also in REPLY to 39 opposition (qc/djy,).
44
12/05/2014
MOTION for Sanctions by Christopher Thornton.
45
03/12/2015
STIPULATION to Withdraw Pending Motions Jointly by Christopher Thornton. Modified on 3/12/2015 to clarify text to reflect as also filed on behalf of Harper Family Partnership LTD (qc/djy,).
46
03/12/2015
ORDER directing that the 36 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, plf's 40 MOTION to Strike, and plf's 44 MOTION for Sanctions are terminated as moot; this case remains closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Paul W. Greene on 3/12/15.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.