Thornton v. Hospitality Management Associates, Inc. et al (mag+)
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2015-cv-00147 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 692 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/05/2015
COMPLAINT against Douglas W. Gurney, Hospitality Management Associates, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602035960.), filed by Christopher Thornton.
1
Filing Fee Receipt
1 Attachment
2
03/05/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff, Christopher Thornton.
3
03/06/2015
Summons Issued as to Douglas W. Gurney, Hospitality Management Associates, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of Complaint
4
03/10/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by F. Lane for Douglas W. Gurney served on 3/7/2015, answer due 3/30/2015.
03/18/2015
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Christopher Thornton.(no pdf document attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
03/24/2015
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Hospitality Management Associates, Inc., with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Nor Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward".
6
03/27/2015
Alias Summons issued as to Hospitality Management Associates, Inc. and returned to counsel for personal service by process server.
7
04/01/2015
Alias Summons issued as to Douglas W. Gurney and returned to counsel for personal service by process server.
8
05/06/2015
Application to Clerk for Entry of Default by Christopher Thornton against Douglas Gurney.
9
05/08/2015
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT entered as to Douglas W. Gurney.
10
08/04/2015
ORDERED that on or before August 18, 2015, the plaintiff shall show cause why this defendant should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. See FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/4/2015.
11
08/18/2015
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Christopher Thornton re 10 Order to Show Cause.
12
08/19/2015
ORDERED that the time for effecting service be and is hereby EXTENDED until October 21, 2015. See FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/19/2015.
13
11/23/2015
ORDERED that on or before December 7, 2015, the plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/23/2015.
14
11/23/2015
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
15
11/24/2015
ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636, this case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/24/2015.
16
12/04/2015
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Douglas Gurney by Christopher Thornton.
17
12/04/2015
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Christopher Thornton re 13 Order to Show Cause.
18
12/04/2015
ORDERED that a hearing on all pending motions and matters be and is hereby SET for December 14, 2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4-B, United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. The court expects the plaintiff to present evidence about efforts to serve the corporate defendant and also evidence about whether service on the individual defendant was properly perfected. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/4/2015. (furn to Def us mail and cmrrr)
12/10/2015
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 18 Order sent to Douglas W. Gurney via CMRRR was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, No Such Number, Unable To Forward, (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
12/11/2015
AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth Dunn by Christopher Thornton. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2015: # 1 Certificate of Service).
20
12/14/2015
ORDERED that the time for effecting service on both parties be and is hereby EXTENDED until January 26, 2016. See FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/14/2015.
21
12/14/2015
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2015 re 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Douglas Gurney filed by Christopher Thornton (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time FTR: 1:59 - 2:14.)
1
Witness List
1 Attachment
12/14/2015
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 18 Order sent to Douglas W. Gurney via US Mail was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, No Such Number, Unable To Forward, (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/28/2016
MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Christopher Thornton.
23
01/29/2016
JUDGMENT: it is ORDERED that: (1) The 22 motion to dismiss is granted. (2) This lawsuit is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice, with costs taxed as paid. (3) The 16 motion for default judgment is denied as moot. The court assumes that defendant Douglas W. Gurney has no objection to the allowance of the dismissal; however, if he does, he must file the objection within seven days from the date of this order. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/29/2016.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.