Thornton v. Paradigm Investment Group, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

2:2013-cv-00344 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 543 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/21/2013
COMPLAINT against Paradigm Investment Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602027220.), filed by Christopher Thornton.
1
Receipt
1 Attachment
2
05/21/2013
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Thornton.
05/22/2013
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Christopher Thornton. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
05/22/2013
Summons Issued as to Paradigm Investment Group, LLC and returned to counsel for personal service by process server.
4
06/17/2013
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Thornton. Paradigm Investment Group, LLC served on 5/29/2013, answer due 6/19/2013. Modified on 6/19/2013 to correct the docket text to reflect the correct service date as 5/29 and the answer deadline as 6/19.
06/19/2013
Reset Answer Deadlines: Paradigm Investment Group, LLC due by 6/19/2013. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
06/19/2013
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC.
6
06/19/2013
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC.
06/19/2013
***Attorney Kelly Fitzgerald Pate for Paradigm Investment Group, LLC added pursuant to the 5 Answer. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
06/20/2013
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer as referral judge; Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
8
06/24/2013
RULE 26(F) ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/8/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/24/2013.
9
07/08/2013
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
10
10/18/2013
NOTICE of Change of Address by Lowell Landis Sexton
11
01/23/2014
MOTION for Order To Set Scheduling Order by Christopher Thornton.
12
01/27/2014
ORDER directing that the motion to set scheduling order (Doc. No. 11) is granted, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/27/14.
13
01/27/2014
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER setting: Final Pretrial Conference for 03/21/2014; Non-Jury Trial for 05/12/2014; Amended Pleadings due from Plaintiff by 11/29/2013 and from Defendant by 12/15/2013; Discovery due by 01/08/2014; Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2013; Mediation Notice due by 01/16/2014; as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/27/14. (Furnished to Calendar/AG)
14
02/24/2014
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL HEARING on March 21, 2014, at 11:30 AM in Chambers 200FMJ, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U. S. Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; TRIAL TERM COMMENCES on April 28, 2014, Montgomery, Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/24/14. (Furnished to Calendar/AG)
15
02/25/2014
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Thornton.
16
02/27/2014
JUDGMENT directing that, pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal (Doc. No. 15), it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this cause is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs, expenses, and fees; the clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/27/14. (Furnished to Calendar/AG)(Term'd: Final PTC 03/21/2014 and Jury Trial 04/28/2014)
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.