Thornton v. r&l Foods, LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:2015-cv-00828 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 663 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/03/2015
COMPLAINT against Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602038915.), filed by Christopher Thornton.
1
Receipt
1 Attachment
2
11/03/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christopher Thornton.
3
11/05/2015
Summons Issued as to Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC; mailed CMRRR with copy of Complaint.
4
11/09/2015
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and Complaint signed by Walter Boston for: Big Bear Holdings, LLC served on 11/7/2015, answer due 11/30/2015; R&L Foods, LLC served on 11/6/2015, answer due 11/27/2015.
5
11/18/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed) by R&L Foods, LLC.
6
11/18/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by R&L Foods, LLC.
7
11/19/2015
TEXT ORDER granting 5 Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/19/2015. (No pdf attached to this entry)
8
12/07/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
9
12/08/2015
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Big Bear Holdings, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/18/2015.
1
Corporate/Confict Disclosure Attachment
1 Attachment
10
12/08/2015
ORDER granting 8 Unopposed Motion for a One-Week Extension to File Responsive Pleading, and the time for the Dfts to file responsive pleadings is EXTENDED from 12/9/2015 to 12/16/2015. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/8/2015.
11
12/08/2015
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Big Bear Holdings, LLC re 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. Modified on 12/8/2015 to add the link to the 9 notice.
12
12/16/2015
Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
13
12/17/2015
RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than January 14, 2015, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/17/2015.
14
01/07/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
15
01/11/2016
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2016, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III; Non-Jury Trial set for 10/3/2016, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 6/9/2016; Mediation Notice due by 7/5/2016; Amended Pleadings by plf due by 3/25/2016, and by dfts due by 4/8/2016; Discovery due by 6/10/2016, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/11/2016. (furn: calendar, eb)
16
02/09/2016
MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses by Christopher Thornton.
17
02/10/2016
(VACATED AND SET ASIDE PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 19 ORDER) ORDERED that the Defendants shall show cause, if any there be, on or before March 2, 2016, why the motion should not be granted. The Plaintiff shall have until March 9, 2016, to file any response he may wish to file. The motion will be taken under submission on that day for determination without oral argument. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/10/2016. Modified on 2/11/2016.
18
02/11/2016
MOTION to Withdraw 16 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses by Christopher Thornton.
19
02/11/2016
ORDERED as follows: 1) The 18 Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED, and the Plf's 16 Motion to Strike is WITHDRAWN; 2) The court's 17 order, entered on 2/10/2016, is VACATED and SET ASIDE. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/11/2016.
20
03/03/2016
MOTION for Extension of Deadline by Christopher Thornton.
21
03/03/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Deadline. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/3/2016. (No pdf attached to this entry)
22
03/21/2016
(STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S 23 ORDER) Objection to Plaintiff's Rule 34 Request to Permit Entry Onto Designated Land and Property filed by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC. Modified on 3/22/2016.
03/21/2016
***Attorney Henry Carlton Hilson for Big Bear Holdings, LLC and R&L Foods, LLC added pursuant to the 22 objections. (No pdf attached to this entry) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
03/22/2016
ORDERED that the 22 Objection be STRICKEN pursuant to FRCP 26(c) and 37(a)(1), as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 3/22/2016.
24
03/25/2016
MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by Christopher Thornton.
1
Exhibit Amended Complaint
1 Attachment
25
03/28/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 24 Motion to Amend complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/28/16. (NO PDF document attached to this notice)
26
03/28/2016
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Thornton.
27
04/11/2016
ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
28
04/22/2016
MOTION for Extension of Deadline (UNOPPOSED) by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
29
04/25/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Deadline. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/25/2016. (no pdf document attached to this entry)
30
06/08/2016
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
31
06/08/2016
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
32
06/08/2016
Evidentiary Submission filed by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
1
Exhibit Tab A
2
Exhibit Tab B
3
Exhibit Tab C
4
Exhibit Tab D
4 Attachments
33
06/09/2016
ORDER: The Defendants' 30 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed on June 8, 2016, will be deemed submitted to this court on July 7, 2016, without oral argument. If either party desires oral argument, such party should so notify the Court and opposing counsel by July 7, 2016. If, after considering the parties' submissions, the Court finds oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be scheduled, and the parties will be notified of the date of the hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/9/2016.
34
06/24/2016
Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference by Christopher Thornton
35
06/30/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Thornton.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
7 Attachments
36
07/07/2016
REPLY BRIEF re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
37
07/07/2016
MOTION to Strike by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
38
07/12/2016
RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Strike filed by Christopher Thornton.
39
07/15/2016
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Strike filed by Christopher Thornton.
40
07/20/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Strike filed by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
41
08/01/2016
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL HEARING: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2016, 11:00 AM, in Montgomery, Alabama, before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2016; Non-Jury Trial set for 10/3/2016, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/1/2016. (furn: EB, Calendar)
42
08/09/2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1) The 37 Motion to Strike is DENIED; 2) The 30 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to Thornton's claims in Counts I, II, and III of the Amended Complaint for injunctive relief only to the extent that they are based on an alleged failure to comply with ADA regulations regarding dispersing accessible tables; 3) The 30 Motion for Summary is GRANTED and judgment is entered as to the Dfts and against the Plf on all other aspects of his claims in Counts I, II, and III of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/9/2016.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
43
08/17/2016
MOTION for Reconsideration in Light of New Evidence, or in the Alternative, Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Big Bear Holdings, LLC, R&L Foods, LLC.
44
08/17/2016
ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall show cause, if any there be, on or before August 26, 2016, why the 43 motion should not be granted. The motion will be taken under submission on that day for determination without oral argument. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/17/2016.
45
08/19/2016
MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Thornton.
46
08/19/2016
ORDER: This case is before the court on a Motion for Reconsideration in Light of New Evidence filed by the Defendants (Doc. # 43) and a Motion to Dismiss filed by the Plaintiff (Doc. # 45). In his Motion, the Plaintiff states that because the Defendants have fully remediated the architectural barriers at the restaurant at issue in this case, he moves to dismiss the action with prejudice. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 45) is GRANTED. The Motion for Reconsideration in Light of New Evidence (Doc. # 43) is DENIED as moot. The case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/19/2016. (term: Final Pretrial Conference set for 09/07/2016; Non-Jury Trial set for 10/03/2016) (furn: calendar, EB, JT)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.