Tiffani Charlene Cameron
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-04124 (alnb)

Notice and Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Modify Confirmed Plan to an amount not less than $100.00. (Related Doc # [50]) Signed on 7/16/2018.

UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: } } Tiffani Charlene Cameron } Case No. 17-04124-DSC SSN: XXX-XX-2817 } } Chapter 13 Debtor. } } } } NOTICE AND ORDER NOTICE is hereby given that on July 11, 2018, the Debtor filed a Motion to Modify Confirmed Plan to reduce the pro rata distribution to unsecured creditors to an amount not less than $100.00; it appears to the Court that said motion is due to be granted; now therefore, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the Debtor's Motion to Modify Confirmed Plan shall be and hereby is GRANTED unless a written objection and request for hearing is filed on or before 21 days from the date of entry of this order. If said objection and request is timely filed, a hearing will be scheduled by a subsequent notice of hearing. Dated: July 16, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford D. SIMS CRAWFORD UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY JUDGE /sva Case 17-04124-DSC13 Doc 52 Filed 07/16/18 Entered 07/16/18 14:33:45 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s)[47] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).

Case: 17 - 04124 - DSC13 BENCH SHEET FOR HEARING ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS Hearing Date: 07 / 17 / 2018 Hearing Time: 10: 30 am Debtor: CAMERON, TIFFANI CHARLENE Co - Debtor: Attorney: BOND, BOTES, REESE & SHINN, P. C. Case Filed: 09 / 25 / 2017 Case Confirmed: 12 / 27 / 2017 () Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. (Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. O Case is CONVERTED to Chapter 7 on debtor's Notice of Conversion. () Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. () Trustee's WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Dismiss is ACCEPTED. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is CONDITIONALLY DENIED, pending compliance by the Debtor with these requirements. (1) the debtor shall cause a full plan payment to be received in the Trustee's office before 4: 00 p. m. on 08 / 16 / 2018; and, (2) the debtor shall cause all plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4: 00 p. m. on the dates due. If the debtor fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the debtor and debtor's attorney, after which the Court may GRANT the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may DISMISS this case without further notice or hearing. Begin Payments: 10 / 25 / 2017 Schedule 475. 00 MONTHLY Payment Method: Order Sent: Employer: SELF EMPLOYED Delinquency Since On Schedule: Actual Payments: Amount Delinquent: 10 / 25 / 2017 4, 275. 00 2. 850. 00 1, 425. 00 Balance Due Claims: Expected Admin: less Funds On Hand: Approximate Balance Due: 27, 477. 89 1, 882. 25 6. 92 29, 353. 22 () Trustee shall send a DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION. () Plan payments are MODIFIED to $ (OTHER: Months (on Schedule) to Pay Out Case: 50 07 / 17 / 2018 Date: Case Filed 10 Months Ago (60 Month Plan) Last 12 Transactions 06 / 27 / 18 Cash 475. 00 04 / 12 / 18 475. 00 02 / 27 / 18 475. 00 02 / 13 / 18 PC 475. 00 01 / 03 / 18 475. 00 11 / 28 / 17 475. 00 Appearances Chapter 13 TrusteeU.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Debtor _ Joint Debtor _ Spouse ✓ Debtor's Attorney or (standing in) Other Deputy Clerk Case 17 - 04124 - DSC13 Doc 53 Filed 07 / 18 / 18 Entered 07 / 18 / 18 12: 12: 30 Document Page 1 of 1 Desc Main

Order Conditionally Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # [47]) Signed on 7/18/2018.

Van−122 [TMD Order] (Rev. 08/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−04124−DSC13 Tiffani Charlene Cameron Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−2817 Debtor(s) ORDER This matter came before the Court on 7/17/18 for a hearing on the Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Case is CONVERTED to Chapter 7 on Debtor's Notice of Conversion. Trustee's WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Dismiss is ACCEPTED. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is CONDITIONALLY DENIED, pending compliance by the Debtor with these requirements. 1. The Debtor shall cause a full plan payment to be received in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on 8/16/18 and, 2. The Debtor shall cause all plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on the dates due and on or before the 16th day of each month thereafter. If the Debtor fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the Debtor and Debtor's attorney, after which the Court may GRANT the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may DISMISS the case without further notice or hearing. Trustee shall send a DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION. Plan payments are MODIFIED to $ Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. OTHER: Dated: July 18, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford United States Bankruptcy Judge sva Case 17-04124-DSC13 Doc 54 Filed 07/18/18 Entered 07/18/18 14:58:00 Desc Order on TMD Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[52] Modification of Plan (All Chapters)). Notice Date 07/18/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-04124-DSC Tiffani Charlene Cameron Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: sarcher Page 1 of 3 Date Rcvd: Jul 16, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 62 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jul 18, 2018. db +Tiffani Charlene Cameron, 8328 4th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35206-2604 cr +Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Bass & Associates, P.C., 3936 E. Ft. Lowell Rd, Suite #200, Tucson, AZ 85712-1083 intp +Felipe Cameron, 8328 4th Avenue Morth, Birmingham, AL 35206-2604 cr +Skopos Financial LLC, c/o Spina & Lavelle PC, One Perimeter Park South, Suite 400N, Birmingham, AL 35243-2327 9504070 +AARONS, 7509 CRESTWOOD BOULEVARD, BIRMINGHAM AL 35210-2306 9504072 +ALABAMA DENTAL ASSOCIATES, 3920 GRANTS MILL ROAD, BIRMINGHAM AL 35210-1204 9504073 ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA, 11 SOUTH UNION STREET, MONTGOMERY AL 36104 9504074 +BARCLAY CARD, PO BOX 8801, WILMINGTON DE 19899-8801 9504075 +BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE, 100 S WEST ST, WILMINGTON DE 19801-5015 9504078 +BESSEMER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, % AR RESOURCES INC, PO BOX 1056, BLUE BELL PA 19422-0287 9504082 +CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, 1600 7TH AVENUE SOUTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35233-1785 9574957 +CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, c/o HOLLOWAY CREDIT SOLUTIONS, LLC, PO BOX 230609, MONTGOMERY, AL 36123-0609 9504086 +DEPT OF EDUCATION/NELNET, PO BOX 740283, ATLANTA GA 30374-0283 9613767 Directv, LLC, by American InfoSource LP as agent, PO Box 5008, Carol Stream, IL 60197-5008 9504088 +FELIPE CAMERON, 8328 4TH AVENUE NORTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35206-2604 9504089 +GRAND CANYON UNIVERSITY, 3300 W CAMELBACK ROAD, PHOENIX AZ 85017-1097 9520859 +Healthcare Authority for Medical West, c/o Comer & Upshaw, LLP, 2107 Second Avenue North, Suite 100, Birmingham, AL 35203-3727 9504094 +MIDLAND MORTGAGE, PO BOX 790067, ST LOUIS MO 63179-0067 9504095 +MIDLAND MORTGAGE, % SIROTE & PERMUTT, PO BOX 55727, BIRMINGHAM AL 35255-5727 9560096 +MidFirst Bank, 999 NW Grand Blvd. Suite 100, Oklahoma City, OK 73118-6051 9504097 NEWPORT NEWS, % CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SVCS, 689 1/2 OGDEN STREET, BUFFALO NY 14206 9504100 +SANTANDER CONSUMER USA, PO BOX 961245, FT WORTH TX 76161-0244 9504101 +SKOPOS FINANCIAL LLC, PO BOX 1640, COPPELL TX 75019-1640 9504104 +STATE OF ALABAMA, DEPT INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS, 649 MONROE STREET, MONTGOMERY AL 36131-0001 9504108 +UAB HOSPITAL, 619 19TH STREET SOUTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35249-1900 9616916 +UAB Hospital, c/o Comer & Upshaw, LLP, 2107 Second Avenue North, Suite 100, Birmingham, AL 35203-3727 9504110 +UAHSF MSO, PO BOX 55309, BIRMINGHAM AL 35255-5309 9504111 +WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, 1601 W COLONIAL DRIVE, ORLANDO FL 32804-7007 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. cr +E-mail/Text: jduran@skopos.us Jul 17 2018 02:16:41 Skopos Financial LLC, 500 E John Carpenter Fwy #300, Irving, TX 75062-3969 9504071 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@rentacenter.com Jul 17 2018 02:17:15 ACCEPTANCE NOW, 5501 HEADQUARTERS DRIVE, PLANO TX 75024-5837 9550414 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Jul 17 2018 02:16:47 Alabama Department of Revenue, Legal Division, P.O. Box 320001, Montgomery, Alabama 36132-0001 9504076 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:42 BELK REWARDS, PO BOX 965029, ORLANDO FL 32896-5029 9504080 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.cocard.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 17 2018 02:27:44 CAPITAL ONE, PO BOX 30253, SALT LAKE CITY UT 84130-0253 9504079 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.cocard.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 17 2018 02:26:54 CAPITAL ONE, PO BOX 60599, CITY OF INDUSTRY CA 91716-0599 9504081 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Jul 17 2018 02:26:58 CARE CREDIT, PO BOX 965033, ORLANDO FL 32896-5033 9504083 +E-mail/Text: BNC-ALLIANCE@QUANTUM3GROUP.COM Jul 17 2018 02:14:15 COMENITY BANK, PO BOX 182125, COLUMBUS OH 43218-2125 9504084 +E-mail/Text: BNC-ALLIANCE@QUANTUM3GROUP.COM Jul 17 2018 02:14:15 COMENITY BANK, PO BOX 182273, COLUMBUS OH 43218-2273 9504085 +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:45 COMENITY BANK/BRYLANE HOME, % PORTFOLIO RECOVERY, PO BOX 41067, NORFOLK VA 23541-1067 9620999 +E-mail/Text: bnc@bass-associates.com Jul 17 2018 02:12:59 Cavalry SPV I, LLC, c/o Bass & Associates, P.C., 3936 E. Ft. Lowell Rd., Suite 200, Tucson, AZ 85712-1083 9504087 +E-mail/Text: electronicbkydocs@nelnet.net Jul 17 2018 02:15:31 DEPT OF EDUCATION/NELNET, PO BOX 82505, LINCOLN NE 68501-2505 9504090 E-mail/Text: JCAP_BNC_Notices@jcap.com Jul 17 2018 02:15:54 IMAGINE CARD, % JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, 16 MCLELAND RD, SAINT CLOUD MN 56303 9616627 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Jul 17 2018 02:27:14 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of NCOP XI, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9614462 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Jul 17 2018 02:27:18 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of Arrow Financial Services,, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9616623 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:14 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition, Company, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9504091 +E-mail/Text: ajacks@uabmw.org Jul 17 2018 02:16:10 MEDICAL WEST, 995 9TH AVENUE SW, BESSEMER AL 35022-4527 Case 17-04124-DSC13 Doc 55 Filed 07/18/18 Entered 07/19/18 00:10:43 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 4 District/off: 1126-2 User: sarcher Page 2 of 3 Date Rcvd: Jul 16, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 62 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (continued) 9504092 +E-mail/Text: helen.ledford@nrsagency.com Jul 17 2018 02:17:20 MEDICAL WEST, % NATIOWIDE RECOVERY SERVICE, PO BOX 8005, CLEVELAND TN 37320-8005 9611220 E-mail/Text: bkr@cardworks.com Jul 17 2018 02:12:48 MERRICK BANK, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10368, Greenville, SC 29603-0368 9504093 +E-mail/Text: bkr@cardworks.com Jul 17 2018 02:12:48 MERRICK BANK, PO BOX 9201, OLD BETHPAGE NY 11804-9001 9567933 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcydpt@mcmcg.com Jul 17 2018 02:14:44 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, PO BOX 2011, Warren MI 48090-2011 9504096 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@sccompanies.com Jul 17 2018 02:17:26 MIDNIGHT VELVET, 1112 7TH AVENUE, MONROE WI 53566-1364 9605654 E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:46 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, POB 41067, Norfolk VA 23541 9504603 +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 17 2018 02:27:50 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 9613812 E-mail/Text: bnc-quantum@quantum3group.com Jul 17 2018 02:14:26 Quantum3 Group LLC as agent for, MOMA Funding LLC, PO Box 788, Kirkland, WA 98083-0788 9504099 +E-mail/Text: newbk@Regions.com Jul 17 2018 02:15:50 REGIONS BANK, PO BOX 10063, BIRMINGHAM AL 35202-0063 9504098 +E-mail/Text: bnc@alltran.com Jul 17 2018 02:13:14 REGIONS BANK, % UNITED RECOVERY SYSTEMS, PO BOX 722929, HOUSTON TX 77272-2929 9504102 +E-mail/Text: jduran@skopos.us Jul 17 2018 02:16:41 SKOPOS FINANCIAL LLC, 500 E JOHN CARPENTER FWY, IRVING TX 75062-3969 9504103 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Jul 17 2018 02:16:47 STATE OF ALABAMA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, PO BOX 320001, MONTGOMERY AL 36132-0001 9504105 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Jul 17 2018 02:28:33 SYNCHRONY BANK, PO BOX 965060, ORLANDO FL 32896-5060 9504106 +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 17 2018 02:40:22 SYNCHRONY BANK/CHEVRON, % PORTFOLIO RECOVERY, PO BOX 41067, NORFOLK VA 23541-1067 9504107 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcydpt@mcmcg.com Jul 17 2018 02:14:44 SYNCHRONY BANK/WALMART, % MIDLAND FUNDING, PO BOX 939069, SAN DIEGO CA 92193-9069 9513758 +E-mail/Text: electronicbkydocs@nelnet.net Jul 17 2018 02:15:31 U.S. Department of Education C/O Nelnet, 121 S 13th St, Suite 201, Lincoln, NE 68508-1911 9504109 +E-mail/Text: bsimmons@amsher.com Jul 17 2018 02:16:20 UAHSF MSO, % AMSHER COLLECTION SERVICES, 4524 SOUTHLAKE PARKWAY, SUITE 15, HOOVER AL 35244-3271 TOTAL: 34 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** cr* +PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 9504077 ##+BESSEMER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, PO BOX 610038, BIRMINGHAM AL 35261-0038 TOTALS: 0, * 1, ## 1 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '##' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as undeliverable. Notices will no longer be delivered by the USPS to these addresses; therefore, they have been bypassed. The debtor's attorney or pro se debtor was advised that the specified notice was undeliverable. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jul 18, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on July 16, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor MidFirst Bank ndbankruptcy@sirote.com J. Suzanne Shinn on behalf of Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com Paul Joseph Spina, III on behalf of Creditor Skopos Financial LLC pspina@spinalavelle.com Case 17-04124-DSC13 Doc 55 Filed 07/18/18 Entered 07/19/18 00:10:43 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 4 District/off: 1126-2 User: sarcher Page 3 of 3 Date Rcvd: Jul 16, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 62 The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system (continued) Robert D. Reese on behalf of Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com TOTAL: 5 Case 17-04124-DSC13 Doc 55 Filed 07/18/18 Entered 07/19/18 00:10:43 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 4 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: } } Tiffani Charlene Cameron } Case No. 17-04124-DSC SSN: XXX-XX-2817 } } Chapter 13 Debtor. } } } } NOTICE AND ORDER NOTICE is hereby given that on July 11, 2018, the Debtor filed a Motion to Modify Confirmed Plan to reduce the pro rata distribution to unsecured creditors to an amount not less than $100.00; it appears to the Court that said motion is due to be granted; now therefore, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the Debtor¶s Motion to Modify Confirmed Plan shall be and hereby is GRANTED unless a written objection and request for hearing is filed on or before 21 days from the date of entry of this order. If said objection and request is timely filed, a hearing will be scheduled by a subsequent notice of hearing. Dated: July 16, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford D. SIMS CRAWFORD UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY JUDGE /sva Case 17-04124-DSC13 Doc 55 Filed 07/18/18 Entered 07/19/18 00:10:43 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 4 of 4

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[54] Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Notice Date 07/20/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-04124-DSC Tiffani Charlene Cameron Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: sarcher Page 1 of 3 Date Rcvd: Jul 18, 2018 Form ID: van122 Total Noticed: 62 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jul 20, 2018. db +Tiffani Charlene Cameron, 8328 4th Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35206-2604 cr +Cavalry SPV I, LLC, Bass & Associates, P.C., 3936 E. Ft. Lowell Rd, Suite #200, Tucson, AZ 85712-1083 intp +Felipe Cameron, 8328 4th Avenue Morth, Birmingham, AL 35206-2604 cr +Skopos Financial LLC, c/o Spina & Lavelle PC, One Perimeter Park South, Suite 400N, Birmingham, AL 35243-2327 9504070 +AARONS, 7509 CRESTWOOD BOULEVARD, BIRMINGHAM AL 35210-2306 9504072 +ALABAMA DENTAL ASSOCIATES, 3920 GRANTS MILL ROAD, BIRMINGHAM AL 35210-1204 9504073 ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA, 11 SOUTH UNION STREET, MONTGOMERY AL 36104 9504074 +BARCLAY CARD, PO BOX 8801, WILMINGTON DE 19899-8801 9504075 +BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE, 100 S WEST ST, WILMINGTON DE 19801-5015 9504078 +BESSEMER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, % AR RESOURCES INC, PO BOX 1056, BLUE BELL PA 19422-0287 9504082 +CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, 1600 7TH AVENUE SOUTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35233-1785 9574957 +CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, c/o HOLLOWAY CREDIT SOLUTIONS, LLC, PO BOX 230609, MONTGOMERY, AL 36123-0609 9504086 +DEPT OF EDUCATION/NELNET, PO BOX 740283, ATLANTA GA 30374-0283 9613767 Directv, LLC, by American InfoSource LP as agent, PO Box 5008, Carol Stream, IL 60197-5008 9504088 +FELIPE CAMERON, 8328 4TH AVENUE NORTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35206-2604 9504089 +GRAND CANYON UNIVERSITY, 3300 W CAMELBACK ROAD, PHOENIX AZ 85017-1097 9520859 +Healthcare Authority for Medical West, c/o Comer & Upshaw, LLP, 2107 Second Avenue North, Suite 100, Birmingham, AL 35203-3727 9504094 +MIDLAND MORTGAGE, PO BOX 790067, ST LOUIS MO 63179-0067 9504095 +MIDLAND MORTGAGE, % SIROTE & PERMUTT, PO BOX 55727, BIRMINGHAM AL 35255-5727 9560096 +MidFirst Bank, 999 NW Grand Blvd. Suite 100, Oklahoma City, OK 73118-6051 9504097 NEWPORT NEWS, % CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SVCS, 689 1/2 OGDEN STREET, BUFFALO NY 14206 9504100 +SANTANDER CONSUMER USA, PO BOX 961245, FT WORTH TX 76161-0244 9504101 +SKOPOS FINANCIAL LLC, PO BOX 1640, COPPELL TX 75019-1640 9504104 +STATE OF ALABAMA, DEPT INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS, 649 MONROE STREET, MONTGOMERY AL 36131-0001 9504108 +UAB HOSPITAL, 619 19TH STREET SOUTH, BIRMINGHAM AL 35249-1900 9616916 +UAB Hospital, c/o Comer & Upshaw, LLP, 2107 Second Avenue North, Suite 100, Birmingham, AL 35203-3727 9504110 +UAHSF MSO, PO BOX 55309, BIRMINGHAM AL 35255-5309 9504111 +WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, 1601 W COLONIAL DRIVE, ORLANDO FL 32804-7007 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. cr +E-mail/Text: jduran@skopos.us Jul 19 2018 02:11:49 Skopos Financial LLC, 500 E John Carpenter Fwy #300, Irving, TX 75062-3969 9504071 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@rentacenter.com Jul 19 2018 02:12:19 ACCEPTANCE NOW, 5501 HEADQUARTERS DRIVE, PLANO TX 75024-5837 9550414 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Jul 19 2018 02:11:57 Alabama Department of Revenue, Legal Division, P.O. Box 320001, Montgomery, Alabama 36132-0001 9504076 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Jul 19 2018 02:18:09 BELK REWARDS, PO BOX 965029, ORLANDO FL 32896-5029 9504080 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.cocard.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 19 2018 02:17:23 CAPITAL ONE, PO BOX 30253, SALT LAKE CITY UT 84130-0253 9504079 +E-mail/PDF: AIS.cocard.ebn@americaninfosource.com Jul 19 2018 02:16:40 CAPITAL ONE, PO BOX 60599, CITY OF INDUSTRY CA 91716-0599 9504081 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Jul 19 2018 02:18:06 CARE CREDIT, PO BOX 965033, ORLANDO FL 32896-5033 9504083 +E-mail/Text: BNC-ALLIANCE@QUANTUM3GROUP.COM Jul 19 2018 02:09:43 COMENITY BANK, PO BOX 182125, COLUMBUS OH 43218-2125 9504084 +E-mail/Text: BNC-ALLIANCE@QUANTUM3GROUP.COM Jul 19 2018 02:09:43 COMENITY BANK, PO BOX 182273, COLUMBUS OH 43218-2273 9504085 +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 19 2018 02:16:47 COMENITY BANK/BRYLANE HOME, % PORTFOLIO RECOVERY, PO BOX 41067, NORFOLK VA 23541-1067 9620999 +E-mail/Text: bnc@bass-associates.com Jul 19 2018 02:08:38 Cavalry SPV I, LLC, c/o Bass & Associates, P.C., 3936 E. Ft. Lowell Rd., Suite 200, Tucson, AZ 85712-1083 9504087 +E-mail/Text: electronicbkydocs@nelnet.net Jul 19 2018 02:10:44 DEPT OF EDUCATION/NELNET, PO BOX 82505, LINCOLN NE 68501-2505 9504090 E-mail/Text: JCAP_BNC_Notices@jcap.com Jul 19 2018 02:11:06 IMAGINE CARD, % JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, 16 MCLELAND RD, SAINT CLOUD MN 56303 9616627 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Jul 19 2018 02:17:00 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of NCOP XI, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9614462 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Jul 19 2018 02:18:36 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of Arrow Financial Services,, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9616623 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Jul 19 2018 02:16:59 LVNV Funding, LLC its successors and assigns as, assignee of CVF Consumer Acquisition, Company, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9504091 +E-mail/Text: ajacks@uabmw.org Jul 19 2018 02:11:20 MEDICAL WEST, 995 9TH AVENUE SW, BESSEMER AL 35022-4527 Case 17-04124-DSC13 Doc 56 Filed 07/20/18 Entered 07/21/18 00:06:18 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 4 District/off: 1126-2 User: sarcher Page 2 of 3 Date Rcvd: Jul 18, 2018 Form ID: van122 Total Noticed: 62 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (continued) 9504092 +E-mail/Text: helen.ledford@nrsagency.com Jul 19 2018 02:12:24 MEDICAL WEST, % NATIOWIDE RECOVERY SERVICE, PO BOX 8005, CLEVELAND TN 37320-8005 9611220 E-mail/Text: bkr@cardworks.com Jul 19 2018 02:08:25 MERRICK BANK, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10368, Greenville, SC 29603-0368 9504093 +E-mail/Text: bkr@cardworks.com Jul 19 2018 02:08:25 MERRICK BANK, PO BOX 9201, OLD BETHPAGE NY 11804-9001 9567933 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcydpt@mcmcg.com Jul 19 2018 02:10:09 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, PO BOX 2011, Warren MI 48090-2011 9504096 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@sccompanies.com Jul 19 2018 02:12:32 MIDNIGHT VELVET, 1112 7TH AVENUE, MONROE WI 53566-1364 9605654 E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 19 2018 02:56:57 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, POB 41067, Norfolk VA 23541 9504603 +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 19 2018 02:55:52 PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 9613812 E-mail/Text: bnc-quantum@quantum3group.com Jul 19 2018 02:09:57 Quantum3 Group LLC as agent for, MOMA Funding LLC, PO Box 788, Kirkland, WA 98083-0788 9504099 +E-mail/Text: newbk@Regions.com Jul 19 2018 02:11:00 REGIONS BANK, PO BOX 10063, BIRMINGHAM AL 35202-0063 9504098 +E-mail/Text: bnc@alltran.com Jul 19 2018 02:08:48 REGIONS BANK, % UNITED RECOVERY SYSTEMS, PO BOX 722929, HOUSTON TX 77272-2929 9504102 +E-mail/Text: jduran@skopos.us Jul 19 2018 02:11:49 SKOPOS FINANCIAL LLC, 500 E JOHN CARPENTER FWY, IRVING TX 75062-3969 9504103 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Jul 19 2018 02:11:57 STATE OF ALABAMA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, PO BOX 320001, MONTGOMERY AL 36132-0001 9504105 +E-mail/PDF: gecsedi@recoverycorp.com Jul 19 2018 02:18:06 SYNCHRONY BANK, PO BOX 965060, ORLANDO FL 32896-5060 9504106 +E-mail/PDF: PRA_BK2_CASE_UPDATE@portfoliorecovery.com Jul 19 2018 02:17:29 SYNCHRONY BANK/CHEVRON, % PORTFOLIO RECOVERY, PO BOX 41067, NORFOLK VA 23541-1067 9504107 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcydpt@mcmcg.com Jul 19 2018 02:10:09 SYNCHRONY BANK/WALMART, % MIDLAND FUNDING, PO BOX 939069, SAN DIEGO CA 92193-9069 9513758 +E-mail/Text: electronicbkydocs@nelnet.net Jul 19 2018 02:10:44 U.S. Department of Education C/O Nelnet, 121 S 13th St, Suite 201, Lincoln, NE 68508-1911 9504109 +E-mail/Text: bsimmons@amsher.com Jul 19 2018 02:11:29 UAHSF MSO, % AMSHER COLLECTION SERVICES, 4524 SOUTHLAKE PARKWAY, SUITE 15, HOOVER AL 35244-3271 TOTAL: 34 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** cr* +PRA Receivables Management, LLC, PO Box 41021, Norfolk, VA 23541-1021 9504077 ##+BESSEMER EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS, PO BOX 610038, BIRMINGHAM AL 35261-0038 TOTALS: 0, * 1, ## 1 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Addresses marked '##' were identified by the USPS National Change of Address system as undeliverable. Notices will no longer be delivered by the USPS to these addresses; therefore, they have been bypassed. The debtor's attorney or pro se debtor was advised that the specified notice was undeliverable. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jul 20, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on July 18, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Enslen Crowe on behalf of Creditor MidFirst Bank ndbankruptcy@sirote.com J. Suzanne Shinn on behalf of Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com Paul Joseph Spina, III on behalf of Creditor Skopos Financial LLC pspina@spinalavelle.com Case 17-04124-DSC13 Doc 56 Filed 07/20/18 Entered 07/21/18 00:06:18 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 4 District/off: 1126-2 User: sarcher Page 3 of 3 Date Rcvd: Jul 18, 2018 Form ID: van122 Total Noticed: 62 The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system (continued) Robert D. Reese on behalf of Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron pn.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort@gmail.com;bbrs.igotnotices@gmail.com;bbrs.sort2@gmail.com;aw.i gotnotices@gmail.com;bbrssort4@gmail.com;R62238@notify.bestcase.com;9382390420@filings.docketbird .com TOTAL: 5 Case 17-04124-DSC13 Doc 56 Filed 07/20/18 Entered 07/21/18 00:06:18 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 4 Van−122 [TMD Order] (Rev. 08/17) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 17−04124−DSC13 Tiffani Charlene Cameron Chapter 13 SSN: xxx−xx−2817 Debtor(s) ORDER This matter came before the Court on 7/17/18 for a hearing on the Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that: Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Case is CONVERTED to Chapter 7 on Debtor's Notice of Conversion. Trustee's WITHDRAWAL of Motion to Dismiss is ACCEPTED. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is CONDITIONALLY DENIED, pending compliance by the Debtor with these requirements. 1. The Debtor shall cause a full plan payment to be received in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on 8/16/18 and, 2. The Debtor shall cause all plan payments due during the next 12 months to be received in the full amounts due in the Trustee's office before 4:00 p.m. on the dates due and on or before the 16th day of each month thereafter. If the Debtor fails to satisfy these conditions, the Trustee may file a Notice of Continuing Default with the Court, with copies to the Debtor and Debtor's attorney, after which the Court may GRANT the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and may DISMISS the case without further notice or hearing. Trustee shall send a DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION. Plan payments are MODIFIED to $ Debtor's CONSENT to the Trustee's Motion to Dismiss is APPROVED. OTHER: Dated: July 18, 2018 /s/ D. Sims Crawford United States Bankruptcy Judge sva Case 17-04124-DSC13 Doc 56 Filed 07/20/18 Entered 07/21/18 00:06:18 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 4 of 4

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 94 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/25/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Tiffani Charlene Cameron
2
09/25/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron.
4
09/25/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron.
5
09/25/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron.
09/25/2017
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(17-04124-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21202549. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/25/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/01/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/28/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 01/30/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 03/26/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 01/02/2018.
7
09/26/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
8
09/26/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron.
9
09/26/2017
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron.
10
09/26/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
09/27/2017
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron Case Number 96-02371, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/08/1996, Standard Discharge on 09/12/1996.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
09/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 09/28/2017.
12
09/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron). Notice Date 09/28/2017.
13
09/28/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 09/28/2017.
14
10/20/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Paul Joseph Spina III Filed by Creditor Skopos Financial LLC.
15
10/20/2017
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor Skopos Financial LLC (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron.).
1
Exhibit "A"
1 Attachment
16
10/23/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 15 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Skopos Financial LLC). Hearing scheduled 11/28/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
17
10/23/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Enslen Crowe Filed by Creditor MidFirst Bank.
18
11/02/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 11/1/2017. (Ch13troffice, jc)
19
11/07/2017
Trustee Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions. (Ch13troffice, km)
20
11/07/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
21
11/07/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 19 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions, 20 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 11/28/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
22
11/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/09/2017.
23
11/13/2017
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses Filed by Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron.
1
Affidavit) (Shinn, J.
1 Attachment
24
11/30/2017
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
25
12/19/2017
Agreed Order Signed on 12/19/2017 (RE: related document(s) 15 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Skopos Financial LLC).
26
12/21/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 25 Consent Order). Notice Date 12/21/2017.
27
12/27/2017
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 12/27/2017 (RE: related document(s) 15 Order submitted on Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor Skopos Financial LLC, 20 Trustees Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are Withdrawn, 19 Trustees Objection to Claim of Exemptions is withdrawn.
28
12/29/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 12/29/2017.
29
01/08/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Cavalry SPV I, LLC.
1
Exhibit Certificate of Service
1 Attachment
30
01/30/2018
Trustee's Objection to Claim # 16 of LVNV funding in the amount of $473.46 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)
31
01/30/2018
Trustee's Objection to Claim # 17 of LVNV Funding in the amount of $414.28 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, kc)
32
01/31/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 30 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway, 31 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway). Hearing scheduled 3/6/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
33
02/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 32 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/02/2018.
34
02/23/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay, Filed by Creditor MidFirst Bank
1
Note #
2
Mortgage #
3
Loan modification agreement
3 Attachments
35
02/23/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor MidFirst Bank (RE: related document(s) 34 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay,).
36
02/26/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Midfirst Bank (RE: related document(s) 34 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor MidFirst Bank, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay). Hearing scheduled 3/20/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
38
02/26/2018
Clerk's Notice of Non-Payment of Filing Fees due in the amount of $181.00 by filer Enslen Crowe, Movant's Attorney for Relief from Stay. Said fees are to be paid within 2 business days from the date of this notice or Motion will be DENIED without prejudice. (RE: related document(s) 34 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor MidFirst Bank, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay). Filing Fees due by 3/1/2018.
02/26/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-04124-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21767202. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 34) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
02/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 36 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 02/28/2018.
40
03/08/2018
Order on Objection to Claims 16 and 17 Signed on 3/8/2018 (RE: related document(s) 30 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway, 31 Objection to Claim filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway).
41
03/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 40 Order on Objection to Claim(s)). Notice Date 03/10/2018.
42
03/22/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 3/22/2018 (RE: related document(s) 34 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor MidFirst Bank, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay). The automatic stay provided for by Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code shall remain in effect. Hearing scheduled 4/17/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
43
03/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 42 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 03/24/2018.
44
04/17/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mr. Tutten shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #34; Motion for Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay Filed by Enslen Crowe, attorney for MidFirst Bank
45
05/18/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 34), Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Co-Debtor Stay (Related Doc # 34) Signed on 5/18/2018.
46
05/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 45 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 05/20/2018.
47
06/15/2018
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Ch13troffice, cs)
48
06/18/2018
Notice of Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss (RE: related document(s) 47 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 7/17/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
49
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 48 Hearing on Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Notice Date 06/20/2018.
50
07/11/2018
Motion to Modify Plan Filed by Debtor Tiffani Charlene Cameron (Shinn, J.)
52
07/16/2018
Notice and Order Granting Debtor's Motion to Modify Confirmed Plan to an amount not less than $100.00. (Related Doc # [50]) Signed on 7/16/2018.
53
07/18/2018
Bench Sheet: (RE: related document(s)[47] Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
54
07/18/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments. (Related Doc # [47]) Signed on 7/18/2018.
55
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[52] Modification of Plan (All Chapters)). Notice Date 07/18/2018.
56
07/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[54] Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Notice Date 07/20/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.