Till v. Autauga co bd of ed, et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:1997-cv-00838 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 513 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/27/1997
COMPLAINT Filing Fee $ 150 Receipt # 65350
2
05/28/1997
SUMMONS issued for Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden; summons and complaint returned to counsel for service
3
05/28/1997
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden 5/28/97 Answer due on 6/17/97 for Allen Weeden, for Willie J. Glaze, for William Hopper, for Autauga Co Bd of Ed
4
05/29/1997
ORDER denying the plaintiff's request for an order enjoining defendants from failing to employ at Marbury High School the same system of naming co-valedictorians of the graduating class as it did last year (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
6
05/30/1997
ORDER denying [5-1] motion to Alter or Amend [4-1] order of 5/29/97 (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW.
7
06/06/1997
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Patricia Till amending [1-1] complaint, referred to Judge Thompson.
8
06/06/1997
SUMMONS issued for Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden; summons and First Amended Complaint returned to counsel for service
9
06/09/1997
MOTION by Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden to Dismiss (Exhibit A attached) referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson (war) Modified on 06/10/1997
10
06/10/1997
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden 6/9/97
11
06/11/1997
ORDER, set Rule l6 Status Conference 8:00 6/23/97 before Judge Myron H. Thompson (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW, MT.
12
06/11/1997
ORDER [9-1] motion to Dismiss by Allen Weeden, Willie J. Glaze, William Hopper, Autauga Co Bd of Ed set for submission on 6/20/97, set Brief deadline to 6/20/97 (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel.
13
06/20/1997
MEMORANDUM by Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden in support of [9-1] motion to Dismiss by defendants. Referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
14
06/20/1997
MEMORANDUM in RESPONSE by Patricia Till to [9-1] motion to Dismiss by Allen Weeden, Willie J. Glaze, William Hopper, Autauga Co Bd of Ed referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
15
06/20/1997
MOTION by Patricia Till to Strike Impertinent Facts in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
06/23/1997
Status Conference held before Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/23/97 (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
06/24/1997
ORDER denying [15-1] motion to Strike Impertinent Facts in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW.
17
06/24/1997
ORDER, set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery cutoff to 7/25/97 ; Non-jury trial set for 10:00 8/8/97, 2nd Floor Courtroom before Judge Myron H. Thompson ; pretrial brief deadline on 8/4/97 (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW, MT.
18
06/30/1997
DEMAND for jury trial by Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden
19
07/01/1997
MOTION by Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden to shorten time plaintiff has to answer request for production, expert witness interrogatories and interrogatories to plaintiff referred to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson
07/08/1997
Stamped ORDER granting [19-1] motion to shorten time plaintiff has to answer request for production, expert witness interrogatories and interrogatories to plaintiff (by Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
07/14/1997
ORDER granting in part, denying in part [18-1] supplemental amended motion to Dismiss, granting in part, denying in part [9-1] motion to Dismiss; granting motions with regard to plaintiff Steven Till's substantive and procedural due process claims under the fourteenth amendment, his state law breach of contract claim, and his Title VII claim; denying in all other respects (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW.
21
07/16/1997
MOTION by Patricia Till for Order to Release Private Records referred to Magistrate Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson (war) Modified on 07/17/1997
22
07/16/1997
MOTION by Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden for Protective Order referred to Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson
23
07/18/1997
Witness list by Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden, referred to Judge Thompson.
24
07/18/1997
Exhibit list by Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden, referred to Judge Thompson.
07/22/1997
Tele-conference held before Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson on Motion for Protective Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
07/23/1997
ORDER that by 7/25/97, the parties shall jointly file a Proposed Protection Order for this court's consideration (signed by Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson), copies mailed to counsel.
26
07/25/1997
ORDER granting [22-1] motion for Protective Order (signed by Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson), copies mailed to counsel.
27
07/25/1997
PROTECTIVE ORDER that the defendants shall make a limited disclosure of any and all transcripts, records, and/or documents related to and/or generated for the purpose of valedictorian determination in the years of l996 and l997, and more specifically those records pertaining to Steve Till, Timothy E. Brucke, Jessica Caver and Courtney Shaw (signed by Mag Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson), copies mailed to counsel.
28
08/04/1997
JOINT MOTION by Patricia Till, Autauga Co Bd of Ed, William Hopper, Willie J. Glaze, Allen Weeden to Dismiss referred to Judge Myron H. Thompson
29
08/06/1997
ORDER dismissing this cause with prejudice, with parties to bear own costs and attorney's fees; (signed by Judge Myron H. Thompson), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to TW and MT.
08/06/1997
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.