Timothy A Rowland
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-00006 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
Avoid Lien
05/21/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/12/2018
Extend Time
27
07/13/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
28
07/17/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
29
07/30/2018
Extend Time
08/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
08/14/2018
Affidavit of Service
31
08/14/2018
Certificate of No Objection
32
08/14/2018
Certificate of No Objection

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.