Timothy Allen Hughes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-02873 (alnb)

Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # {{32}}) Signed on 2/13/2018.

17-02873-TOM13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Timothy Allen Hughes } Case No: 17-02873-TOM13 SSN: XXX-XX-2812 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER CONDITIONALLY DENYING This matter came before the Court on Thursday, February 08, 2018 10:00 AM, for a hearing on the following: RE: Doc #32; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas G. Tutten, Jr., Attorney for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: Stephen Bulgarella, attorney for U.S. Bank Trust Brent William Davis, attorney for Timothy Allen Hughes (Debtor) Mary Frances Fallaw, Staff Attorney for the Chapter 13 Trustee Timothy Hughes It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on arguments of counsel and the pleadings, the Motion for Relief from Stay is Denied Conditioned upon the Debtor resuming regular monthly mortgage payments beginning with the March 2018 payment. The Movant has leave to file a claim for the arrearage balance including fees and costs. In the event of future default, the Movant may file a pleading to renew its motion and a hearing will be scheduled by subsequent notice. Dated: 02/13/2018 /s/ TAMARA O. MITCHELL TAMARA O. MITCHELL United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-02873-TOM13 Doc 50 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 10:48:22 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/13/2018 (RE: related document(s) {{13}} Confirmation Hearing, {{20}} Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, {{28}} Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes, {{38}} Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE). Hearing scheduled 4/26/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.

17-02873-TOM13 1 UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA - SOUTHERN DIVISION In the Matter of: Timothy Allen Hughes } Case No: 17-02873-TOM13 SSN: XXX-XX-2812 } DEBTOR(S). } } } ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING This matter came before the Court on Thursday, February 08, 2018 11:15 AM, for a hearing on the following: 1) RE: Doc #28; Debtor's Objection to Claim #1 of IRS in the amount of $138,692.01 2) RE: Doc #38; Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Edward Q Ragland, Attorney for the Internal Revenue Service 3) RE: Doc #20; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case 4) Confirmation Hearing Proper notice of the hearing was given and appearances were made by the following: Brent William Davis, attorney for Timothy Allen Hughes (Debtor) Timothy Allen Hughes Ed Ragland, Assistant U.S. Attorney appearing on behalf of the Internal Revenue Service Mary Frances Fallaw, Staff Attorney for the Chapter 13 Trustee It is therefore ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: Based on arguments of counsel and the pleadings, these matters are continued to April 26, 2018 at 11:15 am in courtroom number 3 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Dated: 02/13/2018 /s/ TAMARA O. MITCHELL TAMARA O. MITCHELL United States Bankruptcy Judge Case 17-02873-TOM13 Doc 51 Filed 02/13/18 Entered 02/13/18 13:55:59 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[51] Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/15/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-02873-TOM Timothy Allen Hughes Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: mbrown Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: pdf000 Total Noticed: 16 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 15, 2018. db +Timothy Allen Hughes, 1605 15th Ave. S., Birmingham, AL 35205-6201 cr INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, C/O U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, BIRMINGHAM, AL 35203 9418934 +Affinity Hospital LLC, 3690 Grandview Pkwy, Birmingham, AL 35243-3326 9418936 +CBBI, Po Box 590, Bessemer, AL 35021-0590 9418931 +Caliber Home Loans, In, Po Box 24610, Oklahoma City, OK 73124-0610 9543203 +Grandview Medical Center, c/o PASI, PO Box 188, Brentwood, TN 37024-0188 9418937 +MDS/Medical Data Systems, 2001 9th Ave, Ste 312, Vero Beach, FL 32960-6413 9418939 Region/ams, North Building 2nd Floor, Hoover, AL 35244 9418933 State of Ala Dept of Revenue, POB 154, Montgomery, AL 36135-0001 9541344 +U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., Caliber Home Loans, PO Box 24330, Oklahoma City, OK 73124-0330 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. 9505120 E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@revenue.alabama.gov Feb 13 2018 18:30:40 Alabama Department of Revenue, Legal Division, P.O. Box 320001, Montgomery, AL 36132-0001 9418935 +E-mail/Text: bsimmons@amsher.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:21 AmSher Collection Srv, 4524 Southlake Parkway, Suite 15, Hoover, AL 35244-3271 9503085 E-mail/PDF: resurgentbknotifications@resurgent.com Feb 13 2018 18:34:30 Ashley Funding Services, LLC its successors and, assigns as assignee of Laboratory, Corporation of America Holdings, Resurgent Capital Services, PO Box 10587, Greenville, SC 29603-0587 9418932 +E-mail/Text: cio.bncmail@irs.gov Feb 13 2018 18:28:45 Internal Revenue Service TCS, insolvency, 801 Tom Martin Drive, Birmingham, AL 35211-6432 9418938 +E-mail/Text: brprocessor@pfccollects.com Feb 13 2018 18:30:40 Professional Finance Co, Attn: Bankruptcy, Po Box 1686, Greeley, CO 80632-1686 9524251 E-mail/Text: newbk@Regions.com Feb 13 2018 18:29:57 REGIONS BANK, P O BOX 10063, BIRMINGHAM, AL 35202-0063 TOTAL: 6 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 15, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 13, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes brent@brentwdavis.com, 6167146420@filings.docketbird.com Edward Q Ragland on behalf of Creditor INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ed.ragland@usdoj.gov Thomas G Tutten on behalf of Creditor Caliber Home Loans Inc. ndbankruptcy@sirote.com Thomas G Tutten on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc. As it's Attorney in Fact ndbankruptcy@sirote.com TOTAL: 5 Case 17-02873-TOM13 Doc 52 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 ents of counsel and the pleadings, these matters are continued to April 26, 2018 at 11:15 am in courtroom number 3 of the Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. 'DWHG aged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[50] Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 02/15/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 17-02873-TOM Timothy Allen Hughes Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: mbrown Page 1 of 1 Date Rcvd: Feb 13, 2018 Form ID: pdfsty Total Noticed: 3 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Feb 15, 2018. db +Timothy Allen Hughes, 1605 15th Ave. S., Birmingham, AL 35205-6201 cr INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, C/O U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, BIRMINGHAM, AL 35203 9541344 +U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., Caliber Home Loans, PO Box 24330, Oklahoma City, OK 73124-0330 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. NONE. TOTAL: 0 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS ***** NONE. TOTAL: 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Feb 15, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on February 13, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: Bradford W. Caraway ctmail@ch13bham.com, bhamch13@ecf.epiqsystems.com Brent William Davis on behalf of Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes brent@brentwdavis.com, 6167146420@filings.docketbird.com Edward Q Ragland on behalf of Creditor INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ed.ragland@usdoj.gov Thomas G Tutten on behalf of Creditor Caliber Home Loans Inc. ndbankruptcy@sirote.com Thomas G Tutten on behalf of Creditor U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc. As it's Attorney in Fact ndbankruptcy@sirote.com TOTAL: 5 Case 17-02873-TOM13 Doc 53 Filed 02/15/18 Entered 02/16/18 00:07:48 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 2 ents of counsel and the pleadings, the Motion for Relief from Stay is Denied Conditioned upon the Debtor resuming regular monthly mortgage payments beginning with the March 2018 payment. The Movant has leave to file a claim for the arrearage balance including fees and costs. In the event of future default, the Movant may file a pleading to renew its motion and a hearing will be scheduled by subsequent notice. 'DWHG aged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 251 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/07/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Timothy Allen Hughes
2
07/07/2017
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes.
3
07/07/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes
5
07/07/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes.
6
07/07/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes.
7
07/07/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/09/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 08/31/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 11/07/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 01/03/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 10/10/2017.
8
07/07/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes.
9
07/07/2017
Amended Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition to correct debtor address. Filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes (RE: related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)).
10
07/08/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
07/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 07/09/2017.
12
07/10/2017
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes).
13
07/10/2017
Amended Meeting of Creditors (as to the Debtor's address) 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/9/2017 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 10/10/2017.Proofs of Claims due by 11/7/2017.Government Proof of Claim due by 1/3/2018.Confirmation hearing to be held on 8/31/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
14
07/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 07/12/2017.
15
07/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes). Notice Date 07/12/2017.
16
07/12/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 07/12/2017.
17
07/28/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Confirmation Hearing. Hearing scheduled 09/07/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham
18
07/30/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 17 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 07/30/2017.
19
08/10/2017
Meeting of Creditors Held 08/09/2017. (Ch13troffice, sc)
20
08/14/2017
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
21
08/15/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 20 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 9/7/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
22
08/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/17/2017.
23
08/18/2017
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas G Tutten Filed by Creditor Caliber Home Loans Inc.
24
08/20/2017
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes.
25
08/28/2017
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes.
26
08/28/2017
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes.
27
09/08/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 9/8/2017 (RE: related document(s) 13 Confirmation Hearing, 20 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 11/16/2017 at 11:45 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
28
09/10/2017
Debtor's Objection to Claim # 1 of IRS in the amount of $138,692.01 Filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes.
29
09/10/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 09/10/2017.
30
09/11/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 28 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes). Hearing scheduled 11/16/2017 at 11:45 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
31
09/13/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/13/2017.
09/21/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 155.00 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-02873-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (155.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21186238. Fee Amount 155.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-02873-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21293987. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/27/2017
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc. As it's Attorney in Fact
1
Note #
2
Mortgage #
3
Loan Modification
3 Attachments
33
10/27/2017
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc. As it's Attorney in Fact (RE: related document(s) 32 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
10/27/2017
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(17-02873-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21333273. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 32) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
10/30/2017
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (RE: related document(s) 32 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc. As it's Attorney in Fact). Hearing scheduled 11/16/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
36
11/01/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 34 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 11/01/2017.
11/08/2017
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2017
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-02873-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21374657. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
11/08/2017
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 12 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
38
11/15/2017
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.
1
Exhibit A: IRS Proof of Claim, claim1-1, filed 8 Aug 2017, with attached NFTL
1 Attachment
39
11/16/2017
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 38 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE). Hearing scheduled 2/8/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
40
11/16/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/16/2017 10:54:00 AM ]. File Size [ 958 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:40 ]. (RE: Doc #32; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas G. Tutten, Jr., Attorney for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A). (adiuser).
41
11/17/2017
Order and Notice of Hearing; It is further Ordered, based on the pleadings and pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 362(e)(2)(B)(ii), the automatic stay is hereby extended until further order of the Court. Signed on 11/17/2017 (RE: related document(s) 32 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc. As it's Attorney in Fact). Hearing scheduled 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
42
11/17/2017
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 11/17/2017 (RE: related document(s) 7 Confirmation Hearing, 20 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 28 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes). Hearing scheduled 2/8/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
43
11/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 41 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 11/19/2017.
44
11/19/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 42 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 11/19/2017.
45
01/04/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/4/2018 10:15:13 AM ]. File Size [ 314 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:52 ]. (RE: Doc #32; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas G. Tutten, Jr., Attorney for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A). (adiuser).
46
01/05/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 1/5/2018 (RE: related document(s) 32 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, By Caliber Home Loans, Inc. As it's Attorney in Fact). Hearing scheduled 2/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
47
01/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 46 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 01/07/2018.
48
02/09/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/8/2018 10:42:45 AM ]. File Size [ 388 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:05 ]. (RE: Doc #32; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Thomas G. Tutten, Jr., Attorney for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A). (adiuser).
49
02/09/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/8/2018 11:32:27 AM ]. File Size [ 500 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:23 ]. (RE: Doc #28; Debtor's Objection to Claim #1 of IRS in the amount of $138,692.01). (adiuser).
50
02/13/2018
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 32) Signed on 2/13/2018.
51
02/13/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 2/13/2018 (RE: related document(s) 13 Confirmation Hearing, 20 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 28 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Timothy Allen Hughes, 38 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE). Hearing scheduled 4/26/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
52
02/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[51] Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 02/15/2018.
53
02/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[50] Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 02/15/2018.
85
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
90
08/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.