Timothy C. Jordan, Sr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01512 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
doc
05/24/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
42
08/23/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
43
08/23/2018
Certificate of Service
44
08/23/2018
Certificate of Service (Supplemental per LR 3015-1(c))
46
08/29/2018
Certificate of Service
62
12/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
69
01/25/2019
Court Audio
71
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.