Timothy Charles Drake and Paula Mary Drake
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00376 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
10/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
10/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/30/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
10/30/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
10/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/30/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
10/30/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
10/30/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
8
10/31/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
11/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
11/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
11/05/2018
Request for Special Notice
14
11/13/2018
Extend Time
15
11/15/2018
Extend Time
16
11/21/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
17
11/21/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
18
11/21/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
19
11/21/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
20
11/21/2018
Affidavit of Service
21
11/21/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
22
11/21/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
23
11/21/2018
Certificate of Service
11/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
12/12/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
12/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
12/13/2018
Certificate of No Objection
26
12/14/2018
Compensation
27
12/19/2018
Proceeding Memo
28
12/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
12/20/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
01/15/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
30
01/23/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
31
01/30/2019
Withdraw As Attorney (MUST be Titled MOTION & submit an order - if not see Notice events)
32
01/31/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
33
01/31/2019
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
34
02/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
35
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
36
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
37
02/04/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
38
02/15/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
39
02/15/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
40
02/15/2019
Certificate of Service
02/19/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
02/21/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
42
02/21/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
02/22/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
02/26/2019
Certificate of No Objection
44
02/26/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
45
02/27/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
46
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
47
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
48
02/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
49
03/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/05/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
03/05/2019
Proceeding Memo
03/06/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
03/07/2019
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)
52
03/07/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
53
03/12/2019
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
54
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/15/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
03/20/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
56
03/28/2019
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
57
03/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
04/01/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.