Timothy David Caplan and Megan Nicole Caplan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00216 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/11/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
07/11/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
07/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
07/11/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
6
07/11/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
7
07/11/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
07/11/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/11/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
07/11/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
07/13/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
14
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
15
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
16
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
17
08/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
08/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
19
08/06/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
20
08/06/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
08/23/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
10/11/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
22
10/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
10/15/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.