Timothy Holmes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02104 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/22/2018
Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
10/29/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
52
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
55
01/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
56
02/06/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
61
02/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
62
03/07/2019
Court Audio
63
03/13/2019
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
65
03/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.