Timothy et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2019-cv-00002 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/11/2019
Notice of Removal
2
01/11/2019
Declaration
3
01/11/2019
Civil Cover Sheet
4
01/11/2019
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
5
01/16/2019
Notice of Service List
6
01/16/2019
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
8
01/18/2019
Declaration
01/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/20/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
01/22/2019
Order
11
02/21/2019
Answer to Complaint
12
02/22/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
13
03/20/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
14
03/31/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.