Todd Christian Harper
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2017-bk-00283 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
96
06/28/2018
Proceeding Memo
97
06/29/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
98
07/06/2018
Stipulation
99
07/06/2018
Certificate of Service
100
07/11/2018
Approving Stipulation (SA)
101
07/25/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
102
07/25/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
103
07/30/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
104
07/30/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
105
07/30/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
106
07/30/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum)
107
07/30/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
108
07/31/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)
109
07/31/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
110
07/31/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
111
07/31/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
112
08/01/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
08/03/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
08/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
114
08/03/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/23/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
09/27/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.