Todd Christopher Aumick
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2012-bk-00186 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Employ
05/23/2018
Add Party (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
71
06/05/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
72
07/23/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
73
08/02/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
74
08/02/2018
Certificate of Service
08/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
09/13/2018
Certificate of No Objection
76
09/18/2018
Approving Final Report Before Distribution (SA)
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.