Tony Lee Combs and Ruth Anne Combs
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00249 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/04/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
08/04/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
08/04/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
4
08/04/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
08/04/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
6
08/04/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
7
08/04/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
8
08/05/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
08/06/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
08/06/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
08/06/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
08/06/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
11
08/06/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
12
08/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
13
08/08/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
08/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
15
08/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
16
08/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
17
08/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
08/10/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/20/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
19
08/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
20
08/20/2018
Certificate of Service
08/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
08/21/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
08/24/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
09/18/2018
Certificate of No Objection
25
09/18/2018
Relief from Stay
09/18/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
11/06/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
28
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
11/09/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.