Tracy Lynne Spice
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2014-bk-00365 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
60
11/13/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
61
02/08/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
62
02/21/2019
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
63
02/21/2019
Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)
64
03/14/2019
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
65
03/14/2019
Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)
66
04/18/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
67
04/18/2019
Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.