Travis Levi Farris and Sara Danielle Farris
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00245 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/31/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
07/31/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
07/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
07/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
07/31/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
5
07/31/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
07/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
7
07/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
07/31/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
07/31/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
10
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
08/10/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
09/11/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
09/13/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10/07/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/22/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
17
10/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
10/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
19
10/31/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
20
10/31/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
21
11/06/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
22
11/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
11/09/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.