Trevor Mark Hull
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00057 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/21/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
02/21/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
02/21/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/21/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
02/22/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
02/22/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
03/06/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
11
03/06/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
03/06/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
04/09/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.