Troy Houston Hill and Jennifer Lynn Hill
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01681 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
doc
05/25/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
doc
05/25/2018
Declaration
doc
05/25/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities
doc
05/25/2018
Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities
doc
05/25/2018
Schedule J
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
doc
05/29/2018
Trustee Objection to Confirmation of Plan
06/18/2018
Payment of Fee (Full Filing Fee, Installment Payment, Reopen) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
03/13/2019
Transfer of Claim

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.