True North Federal Credit Union v. Kim
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-ap-90003 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/28/2019
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
01/28/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
01/28/2019
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040)
3
01/28/2019
Amended Complaint
4
01/28/2019
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040)
01/28/2019
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/29/2019
Summons Issued
6
02/05/2019
Summons Service Executed
7
02/08/2019
Answer to Amended Complaint (APSANS01)
8
02/11/2019
Setting Scheduling and Planning Conference (Adv. Cases - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
03/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
10
03/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
11
04/18/2019
Proceeding Memo
12
04/19/2019
Setting Trial (SA)
13
04/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
04/22/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
04/23/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.