Trustee v. Jagtiani et al
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

5:2018-ap-90032 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/20/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
2
11/20/2018
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040)
11/20/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/21/2018
Summons Issued
4
11/21/2018
Summons Issued
11/21/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/27/2018
Summons Service Executed
6
11/27/2018
Summons Service Executed
7
02/05/2019
Intent to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
9
02/20/2019
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (NIDS ONLY - Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
10
02/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
03/14/2019
Close Adversary Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.