Tsonis v. Berryhill
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cv-00003 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
24
05/25/2018
Alter Judgment
25
05/30/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
26
06/19/2018
Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
27
09/17/2018
Attorney Fees
28
09/26/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
29
10/01/2018
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.