Tufford v. Sharkey
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00080 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
07/02/2018
Notice of Change of Address
8
07/02/2018
Unissued Summons
9
09/26/2018
Order
10
09/26/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
11
09/26/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/11/2018
Unissued Summons
11/01/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
12/14/2018
Notice of Appearance
02/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
03/05/2019
Status Report
03/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
03/18/2019
Entry of Default
19
03/18/2019
Declaration
20
03/18/2019
Answer to Complaint
21
03/21/2019
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
22
03/27/2019
Scheduling Order
23
05/09/2019
Status Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.