Tunisia Renaye Billingsley
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01597 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 181 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
doc
05/29/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
1
04/12/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Tunisia Renaye Billingsley
2
04/12/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Tunisia Renaye Billingsley.
4
04/12/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Tunisia Renaye Billingsley.
5
04/12/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Tunisia Renaye Billingsley.
6
04/12/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Filed by Debtor Tunisia Renaye Billingsley.
04/12/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01597-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21953124. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/13/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
04/13/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Tunisia Renaye Billingsley Case Number 95-04602, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 08/04/1995, Standard Discharge on 03/17/1997; Case Number 84-03300, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/22/1984, Standard Discharge on 09/18/1987.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
04/13/2018
Appraisal Filed by Debtor Tunisia Renaye Billingsley.
9
04/13/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
10
04/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 04/15/2018.
11
04/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Tunisia Renaye Billingsley). Notice Date 04/15/2018.
12
04/18/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Capital One Auto Finance, a division of Capital One, N.A., c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LP.
13
04/18/2018
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/23/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 7/23/2018.Proofs of Claims due by 6/21/2018.Government Proof of Claim due by 10/9/2018.Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/26/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
14
04/19/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
04/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 04/20/2018.
16
05/08/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Tunisia Renaye Billingsley. (Shinn, J.)
17
05/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 5/23/2018. (Ch13troffice, bc)
doc
05/29/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
19
05/29/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/26/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
20
05/30/2018
Amended Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 6/26/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
21
05/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/31/2018.
22
06/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/01/2018.
23
06/14/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Tunisia Renaye Billingsley (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Tunisia Renaye Billingsley.). (Shinn, J.)
24
07/13/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
30
09/14/2018
Final Hearing Set

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.