Tyler A. Crenshaw
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00173 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/05/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/05/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
06/05/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
06/05/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
06/05/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
06/05/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/06/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
06/11/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
06/21/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
14
06/30/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
07/02/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/14/2018
Change of Address
08/14/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
09/11/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
17
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
09/17/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.