Tyson Chang
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00341 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/08/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
10/09/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
10/09/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10/09/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/09/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
4
10/09/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
10/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
10/09/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
7
10/10/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
10/23/2018
Extend Time
12
10/23/2018
Declaration
13
10/24/2018
Extend Time
14
10/29/2018
Schedules A-J
15
10/29/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
16
10/29/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
17
10/29/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
18
10/29/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
19
10/29/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
20
10/29/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
21
10/29/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
10/30/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
11/13/2018
Notice Request
11/13/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
11/19/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
12/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/01/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
01/02/2019
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
25
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
01/09/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
28
01/09/2019
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
29
01/11/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
30
01/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
31
01/15/2019
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
32
01/16/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
33
01/16/2019
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
34
01/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
36
01/30/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
37
01/30/2019
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
38
02/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
39
02/01/2019
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
40
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
02/01/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
02/01/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
42
02/03/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.