Tyson SMJ General Construction, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00340 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/08/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/08/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
10/09/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/09/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
4
10/09/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
10/09/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Corporation) (BNC Notice)
6
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
7
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
8
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
10/16/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
10/23/2018
Extend Time
11
10/23/2018
Declaration
12
10/24/2018
Extend Time
10/24/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/29/2018
Schedule A/B (Form 106A/B & 206A/B)
14
10/29/2018
Schedule D (Form 106D & 206D)
15
10/29/2018
Schedule E/F (Form 106E/F & 206E/F)
16
10/29/2018
Schedule G (Form 106G & 206G)
17
10/29/2018
Schedule H (Form 106H & 206H)
18
10/29/2018
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202)
19
10/29/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
20
10/29/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
21
10/29/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
10/30/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
QC Remark Re: Summary, Stat & Declaration (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/30/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
10/30/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
10/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
11/16/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
24
11/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
25
12/12/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.