U.S. Specialty Insurance Company v. RJ Aviation, LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00165 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/12/2018
Complaint
2
07/12/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
07/16/2018
Order
4
07/17/2018
Unissued Summons
07/17/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
08/10/2018
Affidavit of Service
6
08/10/2018
Affidavit of Service
09/24/2018
Clerk's Text Notice of Deficiency (Answer) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
10/09/2018
Notice (Other)
10/26/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
11/07/2018
Notice (Other)
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
11/26/2018
Default Judgment
13
11/26/2018
Declaration
14
12/06/2018
Notice (Other)
15
01/10/2019
Clerks Entry of Default
16
01/14/2019
Default Judgment
17
01/14/2019
Declaration
18
01/14/2019
Affidavit
19
02/27/2019
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
20
03/06/2019
Judgment - Default

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.