USA v. Abaya
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00091-60614 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
04/17/2019
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
6
04/26/2019
Continue
7
04/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
8
04/26/2019
Declaration
04/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
05/02/2019
Appoint Counsel
11
05/02/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
12
05/02/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
13
05/02/2019
Notice (Other)
05/06/2019
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
05/06/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
16
05/07/2019
Protective Order
17
05/07/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
18
05/07/2019
Declaration
05/07/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
05/07/2019
Order on Motion for Protective Order
21
05/08/2019
Pretrial Services Report
22
05/14/2019
Arraignment
23
05/14/2019
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.