USA v. Adkins
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00139 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
05/22/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
34
05/22/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
05/22/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
05/22/2018
Unopposed Motion
37
05/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
38
05/23/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
05/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
05/23/2018
Notice (Other)
42
08/30/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/30/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
09/25/2018
Judgment
48
09/25/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.