USA v. Ahn et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00070 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
43
07/05/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
47
10/04/2018
Dismiss
48
10/04/2018
Hearing
49
10/04/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
50
10/05/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
10/09/2018
Order
53
10/09/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss
54
10/10/2018
Plea Agreement
55
10/10/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/11/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
12/03/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.