USA v. Akulaw
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00119-58409 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
59
06/21/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
60
07/02/2018
Unopposed Motion
61
07/02/2018
Declaration
07/02/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
11/26/2018
Unopposed Motion
67
11/26/2018
Declaration
11/28/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
01/29/2019
Unopposed Motion
70
01/29/2019
Declaration
01/30/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
72
03/19/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
73
04/01/2019
Unopposed Motion
74
04/01/2019
Declaration
04/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
04/30/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
77
04/30/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
78
05/02/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
79
05/02/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
05/03/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
05/02/2019
Unopposed Motion
82
05/05/2019
Notice (Other)
83
05/05/2019
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
84
05/06/2019
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
05/07/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
05/06/2019
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
89
05/09/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
90
05/13/2019
Judgment
91
05/13/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.