USA v. Alaelua
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2002-cr-00112-1764 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
179
08/27/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
180
08/27/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
08/27/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
183
08/31/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
184
08/31/2018
Notice (Other)
185
08/31/2018
Order of Detention
09/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
188
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
189
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
190
04/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
191
04/02/2019
Violation Disposition Report
04/05/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/05/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
193
04/05/2019
Order of Release
194
04/09/2019
Judgment on Revocation
195
04/09/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.