USA v. Allen
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00058-60047 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
4
06/18/2018
Pretrial Services Report
06/18/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/20/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
9
06/20/2018
Order of Detention
10
06/20/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
11
07/19/2018
Suppress
12
07/26/2018
Response in Opposition
07/27/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/01/2018
Unopposed Motion
16
08/01/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
08/01/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/09/2018
Plea Agreement
20
08/09/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
08/10/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/18/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
24
10/09/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
25
10/16/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
26
10/16/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
27
10/16/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
28
10/16/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
29
10/19/2018
Notice (Other)
10/23/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
10/23/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
33
10/24/2018
Judgment
34
10/24/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.