USA v. Alto
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2016-cr-00010 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
58
06/15/2018
Order of Detention
06/15/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
06/15/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
60
06/15/2018
Notice (Other)
06/15/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
06/22/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
64
06/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/28/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
07/03/2018
Order of Detention
07/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
07/17/2018
Violation Disposition Report
07/19/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
07/19/2018
Order of Release
72
07/31/2018
Judgment on Revocation
73
07/31/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.