USA v. Amituanai
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00117 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
05/29/2018
Continue
39
05/29/2018
Affidavit
05/30/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
06/12/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
42
06/18/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
43
06/18/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
44
06/19/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
45
06/19/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
46
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
06/26/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
06/29/2018
Dismiss
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
07/02/2018
Judgment
52
07/02/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.