USA v. Andrew
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00495 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/04/2018
Complaint
10/04/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
10/05/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/09/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/09/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
7
10/09/2018
Order of Detention
10/16/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
10/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.