USA v. Angulo
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00069-60247 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/21/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
06/21/2018
Indictment - For Public
3
06/21/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
06/21/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
06/21/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
06/29/2018
Pretrial Services Report
07/02/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
07/02/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
10
07/02/2018
Order of Detention
07/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
07/12/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
14
07/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
15
08/07/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
16
08/24/2018
Continue
08/27/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
08/28/2018
Appear
08/29/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
08/30/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
08/31/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/24/2018
Plea Agreement
24
09/24/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
09/26/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
10/04/2018
Forfeiture of Property
28
10/05/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
29
11/06/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
11/20/2018
Continue
32
11/27/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
11/28/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
01/02/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
35
01/02/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
01/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
01/04/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
38
01/04/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
01/10/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/10/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
01/18/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
01/23/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
01/23/2019
Supplement
43
01/23/2019
Supplement
01/24/2019
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
01/24/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
01/28/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
48
01/31/2019
Forfeiture of Property
49
01/31/2019
Affidavit
50
02/01/2019
Sentencing
52
02/04/2019
Forfeiture of Property
53
02/04/2019
Affidavit
54
02/05/2019
Judgment
55
02/05/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
57
02/20/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
58
02/27/2019
Amended Judgment
59
02/27/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
60
03/20/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
61
04/03/2019
Transcript

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.