USA v. Applebury et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00121 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
169
05/21/2018
05/21/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
170
06/04/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
06/04/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
173
07/10/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
07/10/2018
Docket Annotation re Incomplete/Unreadable PDF (Text entry; no document attached.)
174
07/10/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
176
07/20/2018
Memorandum
177
07/20/2018
Transcript
178
07/20/2018
Transcript
07/23/2018
Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release (Text entry; no document attached.)
181
07/24/2018
Memorandum
07/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
183
07/25/2018
Response in Opposition
184
07/30/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
185
08/01/2018
Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
186
08/03/2018
187
08/17/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
188
08/17/2018
Memorandum
08/21/2018
Order Referring Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
192
08/24/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
08/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/03/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
197
09/11/2018
Exhibit List
198
09/11/2018
Exhibit List
199
09/20/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
200
09/20/2018
Hearing
09/21/2018
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
201
09/20/2018
Notice (Other)
204
10/03/2018
Hearing
205
10/05/2018
DEPS Notice
206
10/10/2018
Notice (Other)
207
10/19/2018
Continue
10/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
209
10/23/2018
Joinder to Motion
10/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
212
10/25/2018
Transcript
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
216
11/02/2018
Order
217
11/02/2018
Notice (Other)
218
11/06/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
219
11/06/2018
Notice (Other)
220
11/06/2018
Notice (Other)
223
11/06/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
224
11/07/2018
In Limine
225
11/07/2018
In Limine
226
11/07/2018
In Limine
227
11/07/2018
Memorandum
228
11/07/2018
In Limine
229
11/08/2018
Notice (Other)
230
11/09/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
231
11/09/2018
Hearing
232
11/09/2018
Notice (Other)
233
11/09/2018
Hearing
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
235
11/13/2018
Supplement
236
11/13/2018
Response in Opposition
237
11/13/2018
Trial Brief
238
11/13/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
239
11/13/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
240
11/13/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
241
11/13/2018
Trial Brief
242
11/13/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing
243
11/13/2018
Trial Brief
244
11/13/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
245
11/13/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
246
11/14/2018
Response in Opposition
247
11/14/2018
Response in Opposition
248
11/16/2018
Order on Motion in Limine
249
11/19/2018
Errata
250
11/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
251
11/19/2018
Hearing
252
11/19/2018
Reconsideration
253
11/19/2018
Notice (Other)
254
11/19/2018
Notice (Other)
255
11/19/2018
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
256
11/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
257
11/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
258
11/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
259
11/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
260
11/19/2018
Notice (Other)
261
11/19/2018
Notice (Other)
262
11/19/2018
Seal
263
11/19/2018
Notice (Other)
264
11/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
265
11/19/2018
Continue
266
11/19/2018
Memorandum
11/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
267
11/19/2018
Expedite
270
11/19/2018
272
11/21/2018
Pretrial Conference
11/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
276
11/23/2018
Continue
11/24/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
281
11/26/2018
282
11/26/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
283
11/26/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/27/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
287
12/03/2018
Release from Custody
288
12/06/2018
Order
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
290
12/07/2018
Status Report
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
292
12/10/2018
Response in Opposition
12/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.