USA v. Applebury et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00121-58433 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
305
01/11/2019
306
01/11/2019
01/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/15/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
312
01/22/2019
313
01/22/2019
02/06/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
318
02/12/2019
02/12/2019
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
321
02/14/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
323
02/19/2019
02/20/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
324
02/19/2019
326
02/22/2019
Transcript
02/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
331
03/08/2019
332
03/11/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
333
03/11/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
03/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
339
03/15/2019
03/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Text entry; no document attached.)
346
03/19/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
347
03/20/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
348
03/22/2019
350
03/26/2019
352
03/26/2019
353
03/27/2019
356
03/28/2019
03/29/2019
Order on Motion for Release from Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
359
03/29/2019
360
03/29/2019
361
03/31/2019
363
04/02/2019
365
04/02/2019
366
04/02/2019
367
04/05/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
368
04/08/2019
369
04/08/2019
370
04/09/2019
371
04/09/2019
Transcript
04/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
373
04/11/2019
374
04/11/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
04/12/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.