USA v. Arce
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00004 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
23
05/24/2018
Unopposed Motion
24
05/24/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/25/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
06/26/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.