USA v. Arce
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00004-59535 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
23
05/24/2018
Unopposed Motion
24
05/24/2018
Unopposed Motion
05/25/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
06/26/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
09/21/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
09/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
10/02/2018
Plea Agreement
38
10/02/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
12/17/2018
Forfeiture of Property
45
01/02/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
46
01/21/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
47
02/12/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
48
02/19/2019
Unopposed Motion
49
02/20/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
50
02/20/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/20/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
02/21/2019
Unopposed Motion
53
02/22/2019
Errata
55
02/22/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
56
02/22/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/22/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
61
03/08/2019
Forfeiture of Property
62
03/08/2019
Affidavit
63
03/11/2019
Judgment
64
03/11/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
65
03/11/2019
Notice (Other)
66
03/12/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.