USA v. Arndt et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00089-58209 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
89
11/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
90
11/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/07/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
03/08/2019
Criminal Judgment of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.