USA v. Arndt et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00091 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
88
07/02/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
89
07/18/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/10/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
94
09/21/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/22/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
10/05/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
97
10/30/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
98
11/02/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/05/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
11/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
101
11/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
11/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
104
11/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
105
11/09/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/14/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
12/12/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/14/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.