USA v. Avery
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2007-cr-00028 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
606
07/26/2018
Modify Conditions of Release
07/27/2018
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
607
07/27/2018
Declaration
608
08/02/2018
Response in Opposition
609
08/09/2018
Reply to Response
610
08/15/2018
Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
611
08/28/2018
USCA Order
612
09/05/2018
USCA Order
613
09/28/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
614
09/28/2018
Response in Opposition
615
10/01/2018
USCA Order
616
10/01/2018
Response in Opposition
617
10/01/2018
Response in Opposition
618
10/02/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
619
10/09/2018
USCA Mandate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.