USA v. Bachmeier
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00103-58182 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
123
06/08/2018
Continue
06/11/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
126
09/13/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
128
09/25/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
09/25/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
131
10/02/2018
Notice (Other)
132
10/03/2018
Notice (Other)
10/09/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
134
10/10/2018
Order
135
11/15/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
136
11/15/2018
Indictment - For Public
11/15/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
139
11/27/2018
In Limine
140
11/27/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/27/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
143
11/28/2018
Notice (Other)
11/28/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
144
12/04/2018
In Limine
12/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
146
12/05/2018
Response in Opposition
147
12/05/2018
In Limine
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
154
12/10/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
155
12/10/2018
Trial Brief
156
12/10/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
157
12/10/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
158
12/10/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
159
12/11/2018
Trial Brief
160
12/11/2018
Response in Opposition
163
12/11/2018
Reconsideration
164
12/11/2018
Response in Opposition
165
12/12/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
166
12/12/2018
Indictment - For Public
12/13/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
167
12/13/2018
Supplement
168
12/13/2018
Notice (Other)
169
12/13/2018
Response in Opposition
170
12/14/2018
Motion Hearing
172
12/14/2018
Supplement
173
12/14/2018
Order on Motion in Limine
174
12/14/2018
Order on Motion in Limine
175
12/14/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
176
12/14/2018
Order on Motion in Limine
12/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
178
12/16/2018
Reconsideration
12/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
180
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
181
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
182
12/20/2018
Response in Opposition
183
12/27/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
12/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
185
12/31/2018
In Limine
186
01/02/2019
Status Conference
187
01/04/2019
Notice (Other)
188
01/07/2019
Voir Dire Begun
189
01/08/2019
Transcript
190
01/08/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
191
01/08/2019
Jury Trial
192
01/09/2019
Jury Trial
193
01/09/2019
Jury Verdict
194
01/09/2019
Jury Instructions
195
01/09/2019
Exhibit List
196
01/09/2019
Exhibit List
197
01/09/2019
Witness List Public Doc
198
01/10/2019
Proposed Jury Instructions
199
01/16/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
200
01/16/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
201
01/22/2019
Order
202
02/06/2019
Transcript
203
02/11/2019
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.